blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2438949 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2438949



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 44
03.02.2014 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
31.10.2012 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
27.09.2012 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
19.09.2012 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
16.08.2012 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
12.05.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
03.05.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.05.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
02.05.2012 Application refused (no designation of inventor filed) Search / examination 1
16.04.2012 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
14.03.2012 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
16.03.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.03.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 3
16.03.2011 European search report Search / examination 2
22.12.2010 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.10.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.10.2010 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
06.10.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
06.10.2010 Description Search / examination 14
06.10.2010 Drawings Search / examination 1
06.10.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4