blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2438949 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201180051238 EP10186732 EP11764228



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017000948Global Dossier 05.01.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201615234849 11.08.2016
US201313825812 08.08.2013
EP10186732 06.10.2010
WO2011EP67416 05.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9440029Global Dossier 13.09.2016B2
US2013310761 21.11.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP10186732 06.10.2010
WO2011EP67416 05.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101897949BGlobal Dossier 12.09.2018B1
KR20130120477 04.11.2013A
Priority number Date
EP10186732 06.10.2010
WO2011EP67416 05.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6012608BGlobal Dossier 25.10.2016B2
JP2013539675 28.10.2013A
Priority number Date
EP10186732 06.10.2010
WO2011EP67416 05.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2624892Global Dossier 14.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP10186732 06.10.2010
EP11764228 05.10.2011
WO2011EP67416 05.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103179998BGlobal Dossier 24.02.2016B
CN103179998 26.06.2013A
Priority number Date
EP10186732 06.10.2010
WO2011EP67416 05.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2011311615B 30.07.2015B2
AU2011311615 11.04.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP10186732 06.10.2010
WO2011EP67416 05.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112013006964 26.07.2016A2
Priority number Date
EP10186732 06.10.2010
WO2011EP67416 05.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2812717 12.04.2012A1
Priority number Date
EP10186732 06.10.2010
WO2011EP67416 05.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL225362D 27.06.2013D0
Priority number Date
EP10186732 06.10.2010
WO2011EP67416 05.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX336162 11.01.2016B
MX2013003413 20.05.2013A
Priority number Date
EP10186732 06.10.2010
WO2011EP67416 05.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ609020 31.10.2014A
Priority number Date
EP10186732 06.10.2010
WO2011EP67416 05.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2577243 10.03.2016C2
RU2013120293 20.11.2014A
Priority number Date
EP10186732 06.10.2010
WO2011EP67416 05.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG188421 31.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP10186732 06.10.2010
WO2011EP67416 05.10.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2012045792Global Dossier 12.04.2012A1
Priority number Date
EP10186732 06.10.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2438949Global Dossier 11.04.2012A1
Priority number Date
EP10186732 06.10.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR083298 13.02.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP10186732 06.10.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI538709B 21.06.2016B
TW201228686 16.07.2012A
Priority number Date
EP10186732 06.10.2010