Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2438949

EP2438949 - Drive mechanism for a drug delivery device and drug delivery device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  17.08.2012
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2012Refusal of applicationpublished on 19.09.2012  [2012/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/15]For all designated states
Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt / DE
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2012/15]
Application number, filing date10186732.306.10.2010
[2012/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2438949
Date:11.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/315
[2012/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Antriebsmechanismus für eine Arzneimittelabgabevorrichtung und Arzneimittelabgabevorrichtung[2012/15]
English:Drive mechanism for a drug delivery device and drug delivery device[2012/15]
French:Mécanisme de commande pour dispositif d'administration de médicaments et dispositif d'administration de médicaments[2012/15]
Examination procedure02.05.2012Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2012/38]
12.05.2012Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/38]
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1923085  (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,7-9 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0052] * * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0078] * [I] 2,6;
 [XI]WO2008058665  (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7-9 * page 9, line 19 - page 23, line 31 * * figures 1-9 * [I] 2,6;
 [X]EP1923084  (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1,9 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0053] *;
 [X]US2009240195  (SCHRUL CHRISTIAN [CH], et al) [X] 1,9 * figures 1-13 * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0091] *;
 [X]US2008071227  (MOSER ULRICH [CH], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0062] * * figures 1-5 *
by applicantDE10237258
    - Rote Liste,
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MARK PUBLISHING COMPANY,
    - Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology,