Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2348495

EP2348495 - Smoke alarm with ultrasound coverage monitoring [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.07.2015
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Atral-Secal GmbH
Im Hofgarten
66131 Saarbrücken / DE
[2011/30]
Inventor(s)01 / Hentschel, Manfred
Dammstrasse 2
65462 Ginsheim / DE
02 / Schaaf, Norbert
Wiesweg 84b
65343 Eltville / DE
03 / Redlich, Frank
Immanuel-Kant-Strasse 4
65375 Oestrich-Winkel / DE
04 / Kroh, Christoph
Am Untertor 5
65510 Idstein / DE
 [2011/30]
Representative(s)Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Otto-von-Guericke-Ring 7
65205 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/30]Fuchs
Patentanwälte Söhnleinstrasse 8
65201 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date10186854.507.10.2010
[2011/30]
Priority number, dateDE2009104753104.12.2009         Original published format: DE102009047531
[2011/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2348495
Date:27.07.2011
Language:DE
[2011/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:G08B17/107, G08B29/04
[2011/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Rauchmelder mit Ultraschall-Abdecküberwachung[2011/30]
English:Smoke alarm with ultrasound coverage monitoring[2011/30]
French:Détecteur de fumée doté d'une surveillance du recouvrement à ultrasons[2011/30]
Examination procedure27.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.10.2011Examination requested  [2011/49]
23.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination09.06.2016Appeal received No.  T2116/16
07.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.06.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
26.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
05.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
30.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1857989  (TECHEM ENERGY SERVICES GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7 * figure 1 * * sentences 1,2, paragraph 1 * * sentence 1, paragraph 2 * * sentence 5, paragraph 16 * * sentence 2, paragraph 17 * * sentence 1, paragraph 18 * * sentence l, paragraph 20 * * sentence l, paragraph 21 * * sentence 3, paragraph 33 * * sentence 2, paragraph 40 * * paragraph [0046] *;
 [XA]US2009243843  (CLOW ROB [US]) [X] 1,5-7 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0002] * * sentence 1, paragraph 3 * * sentence 1, paragraph 11 * * paragraph [0016] * [A] 2-4;
 [A]JPH02128298  (NITTAN CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP1191496  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *