Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2336909

EP2336909 - Interface method and display device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.06.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
08.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2012/39]
Former [2011/25]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Oh, Chang-seok
302 Greenvill Apt 87-1 Uman 2-dong Paldal-gu Suwo-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2011/25]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/31]Gover, Richard Paul , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote LLP
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Former [2011/25]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate
York YO1 6JX / GB
Application number, filing date10187693.615.10.2010
[2011/25]
Priority number, dateKR2009009887916.10.2009         Original published format: KR 20090098879
[2011/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2336909
Date:22.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2336909
Date:07.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.08.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2011/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Schnittstellenverfahren und Anzeigevorrichtung[2011/25]
English:Interface method and display device[2011/25]
French:Procédé d'interface et dispositif d'affichage[2011/25]
Examination procedure07.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/16]
19.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
22.09.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
23.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination23.11.2016Appeal received No.  T0231/17
15.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
04.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.02.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
24.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
28.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
29.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
23.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[I]US6452609  (KATINSKY STEVE [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 1,4,9A-9C,14 * * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 25 * * column 8, line 1 - line 20 * * column 12, line 59 - column 13, line 32 *;
 [A]KR100854252B  ;
 [A]US2004267899  (RAHMAN SHAFIQ UR [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0029] - [0035] - [0 38] , [0 49] , [0 51] , [0 58] - [0060] *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 11, Database accession no. 2009-E52660, XP002655114 & KR100854252B B1 20080826 (KT CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract *