Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2316669

EP2316669 - Tow bar [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.06.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Change - applicantpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ACPS Automotive GmbH
Steinbeisstrasse 6
71706 Markgröningen / DE
[2019/41]
Former [2018/02]For all designated states
Bosal ACPS Holding 2 B.V.
Kamerlingh Onnesweg 5
4131 PK Vianen / NL
Former [2015/02]For all designated states
Scambia Holdings Cyprus Limited
17 Gr. Xenopoulou Street
3106 Limassol / CY
Former [2011/18]For all designated states
SCAMBIA Industrial Developments Aktiengesellschaft
In der Ballota 2a
9494 Schaan / LI
Inventor(s)01 / Wieczorek, Romeo
Waldackerweg 77/1
73732, Esslingen / DE
02 / Riehle, Jörg
Lehenstr. 37
71679, Asperg / DE
 [2014/29]
Former [2011/18]01 / Wieczorek, Romeo
Waldackerweg 77/1
73732, Esslingen / DE
02 / Riehle, Jörg
Lehenstr. 37
71679, Asperg / DE
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/29]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2011/18]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date10188249.620.10.2010
[2011/18]
Priority number, dateDE2009104617929.10.2009         Original published format: DE102009046179
[2011/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2316669
Date:04.05.2011
Language:DE
[2011/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2316669
Date:16.07.2014
Language:DE
[2014/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:B60D1/06, B60D1/36, B60D1/62
[2011/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/18]
TitleGerman:Anhängekupplung[2011/18]
English:Tow bar[2011/18]
French:Attelage[2011/18]
Examination procedure04.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.11.2011Examination requested  [2011/50]
05.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2014Fee for grant paid
05.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP14176932.3  / EP2815900
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.02.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.04.2015  15.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
WESTFALIA - Automotive GmbH
Am Sandberg 45
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bregenzer und Reule Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Neckarstraße 47
73728 Esslingen / DE
 02  16.04.2015  22.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Brink Towing Systems B.V.
Industrieweg 5
7951 CX Staphorst / NL
Opponent's representative
Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/22]
Opponent(s)01  10.04.2015  15.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
WESTFALIA - Automotive GmbH
Am Sandberg 45
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bregenzer und Reule Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Neckarstraße 47
73728 Essslingen / DE
 02  16.04.2015  22.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Brink Towing Systems B.V.
Industrieweg 5
7951 CX Staphorst / NL
Opponent's representative
Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
Former [2015/21]
Opponent(s)01  10.04.2015  15.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
WESTFALIA - Automotive GmbH
Am Sandberg 45
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bregenzer und Reule Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Neckarstraße 47
73728 Essslingen / DE
01.06.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.12.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
13.02.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.02.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition06.04.2017Appeal received No.  T0855/17
13.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
03.04.2017Appeal received No.  T0855/17
07.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
13.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.10.2010
AL16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MK16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
SM16.07.2014
TR16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
GB20.10.2014
IE20.10.2014
LU20.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
AT20.10.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU20.10.2010
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MK16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
SM16.07.2014
TR16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
GB20.10.2014
IE20.10.2014
LU20.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
AT20.10.2015
Former [2017/18]HU20.10.2010
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
SM16.07.2014
TR16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
GB20.10.2014
IE20.10.2014
LU20.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
AT20.10.2015
Former [2016/33]HU20.10.2010
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
SM16.07.2014
TR16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
GB20.10.2014
IE20.10.2014
LU20.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2016/32]HU20.10.2010
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
SM16.07.2014
TR16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
GB20.10.2014
IE20.10.2014
LU20.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2016/22]CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
SM16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
GB20.10.2014
IE20.10.2014
LU20.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/50]CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
GB20.10.2014
IE20.10.2014
LU20.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/46]CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
GB20.10.2014
IE20.10.2014
LU20.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/36]CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
GB20.10.2014
LU20.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/33]CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
LU20.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/30]CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
LU20.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/27]CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
LU20.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/26]CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
LU20.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/23]CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/22]CY16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/12]CY16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/10]ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT16.07.2014
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1477338  (ORIS FAHRZEUGTEILE RIEHLE H [DE]) [X] 1,3-8,11,13,15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0032] * * paragraphs [0042] , [0043] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0132] * * paragraph [0155] - paragraphs [0163] , [0168] * * figures 1,2,5,6,18-21 * [I] 10;
 [A]WO2004012051  (ZIELINSKI REUBEN Q [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 5, line 10 - page 7, line 13 * * figures 1,3-7 *;
 [A]EP1435305  (ORIS FAHRZEUGTEILE RIEHLE H [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,3 * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0071] *
by applicantEP1002671