Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2316854

EP2316854 - Process for the production of a hybridoma and antibody obtained therefrom, able to recognize more than one vitamin D metabolite. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.11.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Diasource Immunoassays S.A.
Rue du Bosquet 2
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
[N/P]
Former [2013/49]For all designated states
Diasource Immunoassays S.A.
Rue de l'Industrie 8
1400 Nivelles / BE
Former [2011/18]For all designated states
Diasource Immunoassays S.A.
Rue de l'Industrie 8
1400 Nivelles / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Anciaux, Michel
rue de Gourdinne 12
6120 Nalinnes / BE
02 / Mathieu, Fabienne
rue du Cheval Godet 86
1400 Nivelles / BE
03 / Lin, Frédéric
rue du Château 4a
1470 Bousval / BE
04 / Poncelet, Martin
rue des Annettes 2/004
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
 [2011/18]
Representative(s)Paemen, Liesbet R.J. , et al
De Clercq & Partners cvba Edgard Gevaertdreef 10 a
9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE
[2013/29]
Former [2011/18]Pecher, Nicolas , et al
Pecher Consultants SPRL Centre Monnet - Avenue Jean Monnet, 1
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
Application number, filing date10189130.727.10.2010
[2011/18]
Priority number, dateBE2010000023412.04.2010         Original published format: BE 201000234
US20090255164P27.10.2009         Original published format: US 255164 P
WO2009EP6414827.10.2009         Original published format: PCT/EP2009/064148
[2011/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2316854
Date:04.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2316854
Date:04.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/26, C07K16/44, G01N33/82
[2013/22]
Former International [2011/18]C07K16/26, C07K16/44
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/18]
TitleGerman:Prozess zur Produktion einer Hybridomzelle und eines daraus gewonnenen Antikörpers, der mehr als einen Vitamin D Metaboliten erkennt[2016/44]
English:Process for the production of a hybridoma and antibody obtained therefrom, able to recognize more than one vitamin D metabolite.[2011/18]
French:Procédé de production d'un hybridome et d'anticorps obtenu de celui-ci, capable de reconnaître plus qu'un métabolite de vitamine D.[2011/18]
Former [2011/18]Prozess zur Produktion einer Hybridomzelle und eines daraus gewonnenen Antikörpers, der mehr als einen Vitamin D Metaboliten erkennt.
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure27.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.10.2011Examination requested  [2011/49]
02.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.10.2013Fee for grant paid
03.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.07.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.08.2014  02.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau N.V.
PO Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
 02  27.08.2014  02.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Immundiagnostik AG
Stubenwald-Allee 8a
64625 Bensheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Benedum, Ulrich Max
Nebens IP
Patente Marken Designs
Oberföhringer Strasse 172
81925 München / DE
 03  03.09.2014  22.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc.
511 Benedict Avenue
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 04  04.09.2014  23.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Euroimmun Medizinische Labordiagnostika AG
Seekamp 31
23560 Lübeck / DE
 05  04.09.2014  24.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Opponent's representative
Miller, David James, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2016/41]
Opponent(s)01  11.08.2014  02.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau N.V.
PO Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
 02  27.08.2014  02.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Immundiagnostik AG
Stubenwald-Allee 8a
64625 Bensheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Benedum, Ulrich Max
Nebens IP
Patente Marken Designs
Oberföhringer Strasse 172
81925 München / DE
 03  03.09.2014  22.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc.
511 Benedict Avenue
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 04  04.09.2014  23.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Euroimmun Medizinische Labordiagnostika AG
Seekamp 31
23560 Lübeck / DE
 05  04.09.2014  24.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Opponent's representative
Miller, David James, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2016/08]
Opponent(s)01  11.08.2014  02.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau N.V.
J.W. Frisolaan 13
2517 JS Den Haag / NL
 02  27.08.2014  02.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Immundiagnostik AG
Stubenwald-Allee 8a
64625 Bensheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Benedum, Ulrich Max
NEBENS IP - Patente Marken Design
Oberföhringer Strasse 172
81925 München / DE
 03  03.09.2014  22.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc.
511 Benedict Avenue
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 04  04.09.2014  23.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Euroimmun Medizinische Labordiagnostika AG
Seekamp 31
23560 Lübeck / DE
 05  04.09.2014  24.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Opponent's representative
Miller, David James, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2015/42]
Opponent(s)01  11.08.2014  02.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau N.V.
J.W. Frisolaan 13
2517 JS Den Haag / NL
 02  27.08.2014  02.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Immundiagnostik AG
Stubenwald-Allee 8a
64625 Bensheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Margue, Robert Germain
Haseltine Lake LLP
Theatinerstraße 3
80333 München / DE
 03  03.09.2014  22.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc.
511 Benedict Avenue
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 04  04.09.2014  23.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Euroimmun Medizinische Labordiagnostika AG
Seekamp 31
23560 Lübeck / DE
 05  04.09.2014  24.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Opponent's representative
Miller, David James, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2015/03]
Opponent(s)01  11.08.2014  02.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau N.V.
J.W. Frisolaan 13
2517 JS Den Haag / NL
 02  27.08.2014  02.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Immundiagnostik AG
Stubenwald-Allee 8a
64625 Bensheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Margue, Robert Germain
Haseltine Lake LLP
Theatinerstraße 3
80333 München / DE
 03  03.09.2014  22.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc.
511 Benedict Avenue
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
Opponent's representative
Bassett, Richard Simon
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 04  04.09.2014  23.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Euroimmun Medizinische Labordiagnostika AG
Seekamp 31
23560 Lübeck / DE
 05  04.09.2014  24.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Opponent's representative
Miller, David James, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2014/42]
Opponent(s)01  11.08.2014  02.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau N.V.
J.W. Frisolaan 13
2517 JS Den Haag / NL
 02  27.08.2014  02.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Immundiagnostik AG
Stubenwald-Allee 8a
64625 Bensheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Benedum, Ulrich Max
Haseltine Lake LLP Theatinerstrasse 3
80333 München / DE
 03  03.09.2014   
Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc.
511 Benedict Avenue
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
Opponent's representative
Bassett, Richard Simon
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 04  04.09.2014   
Euroimmun Medizinische Labordiagnostika AG
Seekamp 31
23560 Lübeck / DE
 05  04.09.2014   
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Opponent's representative
Miller, David James, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2014/41]
Opponent(s)01  11.08.2014  02.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau N.V.
J.W. Frisolaan 13
2517 JS Den Haag / NL
 02  27.08.2014  02.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Immundiagnostik AG
Stubenwald-Allee 8a
64625 Bensheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Benedum, Ulrich Max
Haseltine Lake LLP Theatinerstrasse 3
80333 München / DE
 03  03.09.2014   
Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc.
511 Benedict Avenue
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
Opponent's representative
Bassett, Richard Simon
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2014/38]
Opponent(s)01  11.08.2014   
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau N.V.
J.W. Frisolaan 13
2517 JS Den Haag / NL
17.10.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.02.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
26.10.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.10.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition28.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0032/17
24.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
02.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.10.2010
AL04.12.2013
AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
IT04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
MK04.12.2013
MT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
SM04.12.2013
TR04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
GR05.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
IE27.10.2018
LU27.10.2018
[2019/48]
Former [2019/30]HU27.10.2010
AL04.12.2013
AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
IT04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
MK04.12.2013
MT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
SM04.12.2013
TR04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
GR05.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
LU27.10.2018
Former [2018/46]HU27.10.2010
AL04.12.2013
AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
IT04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
MK04.12.2013
MT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
SM04.12.2013
TR04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
GR05.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2018/30]HU27.10.2010
AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
IT04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
MK04.12.2013
MT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
SM04.12.2013
TR04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
GR05.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2016/33]HU27.10.2010
AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
IT04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
MT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
SM04.12.2013
TR04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
GR05.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2016/32]HU27.10.2010
AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
IT04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
SM04.12.2013
TR04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
GR05.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2016/28]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
IT04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
SM04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
GR05.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2016/22]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
IT04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
SM04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2015/37]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
IT04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2015/27]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2015/14]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2014/48]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2014/37]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2014/36]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
Former [2014/34]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/26]AT04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/25]AT04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/24]AT04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/23]FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/22]FI04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/20]LT04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0092004  (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [X] 13-17 * example - *;
 [X]US4585741  (CLEVINGER BRIAN L [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * examples 1,2 *;
 [X]  - HOLLIS B W ET AL, "DETERMINATION OF VITAMIN D STATUS BY RADIOIMMUNOASSAY WITH AN 125I-LABELED TRACER", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, DC, (19930101), vol. 39, no. 3, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 529 - 533, XP002054204 [X] 13-17 * page 530, colonne de droite, § "preparation of radioiodinated vitamin D" page 532, colonne de gauche, 3eme paragraph, résumé,;; table 1 *
 [X]  - PERRY H M ET AL, "Monoclonal antibody with high affinity for 1,25-dihydroxycholecalciferol", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/0006-291X(83)91482-1, vol. 112, no. 2, ISSN 0006-291X, (19830429), pages 431 - 436, (19830429), XP024842389 [X] 1-21 * Materials and methods, Results and Discussion *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(83)91482-1
 [X]  - KOBAYASHI NORIHIRO ET AL, "PRODUCTION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES AGAINST TWO HAPTENIC DERIVATIVES OF 1ALPHA,25-DIHYDROXYVITAMIN D3 CONJUGATED WITH BOVINE SERUM ALBUMIN THROUGH THE C-3 OR C-24 POSITION", BIOLOGICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN (OF JAPAN), PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, TOKYO, JP, (19970101), vol. 20, no. 9, ISSN 0918-6158, pages 948 - 953, XP001248794 [X] 1-21 * "Materials and methods, results" *
 [X]  - KOBAYASHI N ET AL, "PRODUCTION OF A GROUP-SPECIFIC ANTIBODY TO 1ALPHA,25-DIHYDROXYVITAMIN D AND ITS DERIVATIVES HAVING THE 1ALPHA,3BETA-DIHYDROXYLATED A-RING STRUCTURE", STEROIDS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/0039-128X(94)90009-4, (19940701), vol. 59, no. 7, ISSN 0039-128X, pages 404 - 411, XP000570695 [X] 13-17 * Materials and methods; Results *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0039-128X(94)90009-4
 [X]  - CLEMENS T L ET AL, "A simple method for generation of antibodies with specificity for 1,25-dihydroxyergocalciferol and 1,25-dihydroxycholecalciferol", STEROIDS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/0039-128X(83)90114-9, vol. 42, no. 5, ISSN 0039-128X, (19831101), pages 503 - 509, (19831101), XP023581539 [X] 13-17 * Materials and methods; Results *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0039-128X(83)90114-9
by applicantEP0092004
 WO2007039193
 US4585741
 WO03104820
 WO2007039194
    - HOLLIS ET AL., CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 39, pages 529 - 533
    - KOBAYASHI ET AL., STEROIDS, (1994), vol. 59, pages 401 - 411
    - CLEMENS ET AL., STEROIDS, (1983), vol. 42, pages 503 - 509
    - PERRY ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1983), vol. 112, pages 431 - 436
    - KOBAYASHI ET AL., BIOL. PHARM. BULL., (1997), vol. 20, no. 9, pages 948 - 953
    - KOBAYASHI, "Production and specificity of antisera raised against 25-hydroxyvitamin D3-[C-3]-bovine serum albumin conjugates", STEROIDS, (1992), vol. 57, no. 10, pages 488 - 493
    - BASALP, "Immunogenic Cu2+-induced Biopolymer systems comprising a steroid hormone, protein antigen, and synthetic polyelectrolytes", HYBRIDOMA AND HYBRIDOMICS, (2002), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 45 - 51
    - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), pages 495 - 497
    - EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1976), pages 511 - 519
OppositionEP1097132
    - "Data Sheet and Manual 25(OH) Vitamin D3 Antibody Monoclonal", Immundiagnostik AG, (20070613), XP055297221
    - "Linscott's Directory of Immunological and Biological Reagents", Linscott's Directory, (20070307), pages 1 - 4, XP055297224
    - "Manual (O2-D15) of the 25-hydroxyvitamin-D ELISA kit (Art. No. K2109)", Immundiagnostik AG, (20081100), pages 1 - 13, XP055297251