Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2317279

EP2317279 - Method and device for measuring thickness of multilayer film [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.08.2016
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.09.2016  [2016/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yokogawa Electric Corporation
9-32, Nakacho 2-chome
Musashino-shi
Tokyo 180-8750 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2011/18]For all designated states
Yokogawa Electric Corporation
9-32, Nakacho 2-chome, Musashino-shi
Tokyo 180-8750 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nishida, Kazufumi
c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome
Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP
 [2011/18]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/18]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date10189336.029.10.2010
[2011/18]
Priority number, dateJP2009025026030.10.2009         Original published format: JP 2009250260
[2011/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2317279
Date:04.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:G01B11/06
[2011/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Messung der Dicke eines mehrschichtigen Films[2011/18]
English:Method and device for measuring thickness of multilayer film[2011/18]
French:Procédé et dispositif de mesure de l'épaisseur des films de multicouches[2011/18]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.10.2011Examination requested  [2011/49]
11.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/38]
17.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/38]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.12.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5587792  (NISHIZAWA SEIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * column 1 - column 5 * * column 16 - column 18 * [I] 2,3,5,6;
 [ID]US2008266550  (NISHIDA KAZUFUMI [JP], et al) [ID] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0070] *;
 [A]US2007008549  (JEONG SEONG Y [KR], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
by applicantJP2009250260
 JP2008292473