Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2450242

EP2450242 - Automobile access and/or starting identifier with removable data medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.07.2015
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VALEO Sicherheitssysteme GmbH
Waldstrasse 2
85253 Erdweg / DE
[2012/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Winter, Andreas
Von Gravenreuth Str. 40
81827, München / DE
 [2012/19]
Representative(s)Jacquot, Ludovic R. G.
Valeo Sécurité Habitacle
Service Propriété Industrielle
76, rue Auguste Perret
ZI Europarc
94046 Créteil Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/38]Jacquot, Ludovic R. G.
Valeo Sécurité Habitacle
Service Propriété Industrielle
76 Rue Auguste Perret
ZI Europarc
94046 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2012/19]Jacquot, Ludovic R. G.
Valeo Sécurité Habitacle Service Propriété Industrielle 76 Rue Auguste Perret ZI Europarc
94046 Créteil Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date10190287.205.11.2010
[2012/19]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2450242
Date:09.05.2012
Language:FR
[2012/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2450242
Date:17.09.2014
Language:FR
[2014/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:B60R25/00, G06K7/00, H04B1/38, G07C9/00
[2012/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/19]
TitleGerman:Zugangs- und/oder Anlassidentifizierung für Kraftfahrzeug über Wechseldatenträger[2012/19]
English:Automobile access and/or starting identifier with removable data medium[2012/19]
French:Identifiant d'accès et/ou de démarrage de véhicule automobile à support de données amovible[2012/19]
Examination procedure08.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2012Examination requested  [2012/52]
27.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2014Fee for grant paid
06.08.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.05.2013
Opposition(s)18.06.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.11.2010
AL17.09.2014
AT17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MK17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
IE05.11.2014
LU05.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU05.11.2010
AT17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MK17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
IE05.11.2014
LU05.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2016/33]HU05.11.2010
AT17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
MT17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
IE05.11.2014
LU05.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2016/32]HU05.11.2010
AT17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
TR17.09.2014
IE05.11.2014
LU05.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2016/28]AT17.09.2014
BG17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
IE05.11.2014
LU05.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2016/22]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
SM17.09.2014
IE05.11.2014
LU05.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/50]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SI17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
IE05.11.2014
LU05.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/46]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
IE05.11.2014
LU05.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/37]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
IT17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
LU05.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/35]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
DK17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
LU05.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/33]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
LU05.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/32]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
MC17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
LU05.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/30]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
LU05.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/25]AT17.09.2014
CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/24]CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
PL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/23]CY17.09.2014
CZ17.09.2014
EE17.09.2014
ES17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
SK17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
IS17.01.2015
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/22]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
RO17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
PT19.01.2015
Former [2015/16]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
NL17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
HR17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
LV17.09.2014
RS17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY17.09.2014
FI17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
GR18.12.2014
Former [2015/10]FI17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
NO17.12.2014
Former [2015/09]FI17.09.2014
LT17.09.2014
SE17.09.2014
Former [2015/08]LT17.09.2014
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2006219776  (FINN DAVID [IE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0249] - [0251] - [0311] , [0312]; figures 1A-G *;
 [Y]EP1030260  (AMPHENOL TUCHEL ELECT [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0016] - [0019] - [0028]; figures 1,2 *