Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2450796

EP2450796 - Systems and/or methods for appropriately handling events [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI, MC
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Software AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[2012/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Schöning, Harald
Theobaldstr. 36
64807, Dieburg / DE
 [2012/19]
Representative(s)Wunsch, Alexander
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2017/13]
Former [2012/19]Wunsch, Alexander
Bardehle Pagenberg
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date10192673.126.11.2010
[2012/19]
Priority number, dateUS2010092622303.11.2010         Original published format: US 926223
[2012/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2450796
Date:09.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2450796
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/54, G06F17/30
[2012/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/19]
TitleGerman:Systeme und/oder Verfahren zur angemessenen Handhabung von Ereignissen[2012/19]
English:Systems and/or methods for appropriately handling events[2012/19]
French:Systèmes et/ou procédés pour gérer convenablement des événements[2012/19]
Examination procedure26.11.2010Examination requested  [2012/19]
09.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
19.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2017Fee for grant paid
16.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.08.2015
Opposition(s)03.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
19.05.2016Request for further processing filed
19.05.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.06.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
[2018/33]
Former [2018/25]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
RS29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[DY]US2010030896  (CHANDRAMOULI BADRISH [US], et al) [DY] 1-15 * paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0163] *;
 [Y]US2010153363  (SUZUKI NAOHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] *;
 [A]US2008301124  (ALVES ALEXANDRE DE CASTRO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] *
by applicantUS2009292877
 US2009292759
 US2009064182
 US2010251262
 US2010030896