blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2458077

EP2458077 - A method of controlling a rotatable-drum laundry drier and a rotatable-drum laundry drier implementing the method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2016
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V.
Raketstraat 40
1130 Brussels / BE
[2015/21]
Former [2012/22]For all designated states
Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V.
Raketstraat 40
1130 Brussels / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Altinier, Fabio
Electrolux Italia S.p.A.
Corso Lino Zanussi, 30
33080 Porcia (PN) / IT
02 / Ragogna, Roberto
Electrolux Italia S.p.A.
Corso Lino Zanussi, 30
33080 Porcia (PN) / IT
03 / Bisaro, Michele
Electrolux Italia S.p.A.
Corso Lino Zanussi, 30
33080 Porcia (PN) / IT
 [2012/22]
Representative(s)Nardoni, Andrea, et al
Electrolux Italia S.p.A.
Corso Lino Zanussi, 30
33080 Porcia (PN) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2012/22]Nardoni, Andrea, et al
Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi, 30
33080 Porcia (PN) / IT
Application number, filing date10192900.829.11.2010
[2012/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2458077
Date:30.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2458077
Date:20.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.2011
ClassificationIPC:D06F58/28
[2012/22]
CPC:
D06F58/46 (EP,US); F26B25/16 (US); F26B3/02 (US);
D06F2101/06 (EP,US); D06F2103/04 (EP,US); D06F2103/08 (EP,US);
D06F2105/28 (EP,US); D06F58/38 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/21]
Former [2012/22]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Steuerung eines mit Drehtrommel ausgestatteten Wäschetrockners und Wäschetrockner zur dessen Ausführung[2014/52]
English:A method of controlling a rotatable-drum laundry drier and a rotatable-drum laundry drier implementing the method[2012/22]
French:Procédé de contrôle d'un sèche-linge à tambour rotatif et sèche-linge à tambour rotatif implémentant le procédé[2012/22]
Former [2012/22]Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Wäschetrockners mit Drehtrommel und Wäschetrockner mit Drehtrommel mit dem Verfahren
Examination procedure30.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/02]
18.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2015Fee for grant paid
08.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.12.2014
Opposition(s)23.02.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
02.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.11.2010
AL20.05.2015
AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CY20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MK20.05.2015
MT20.05.2015
NL20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SE20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
SM20.05.2015
TR20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE29.11.2015
LU29.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU29.11.2010
AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CY20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MK20.05.2015
MT20.05.2015
NL20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SE20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
SM20.05.2015
TR20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE29.11.2015
LU29.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2017/38]HU29.11.2010
AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CY20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
MT20.05.2015
NL20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SE20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
SM20.05.2015
TR20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE29.11.2015
LU29.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/45]AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
IE29.11.2015
LU29.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/37]AT20.05.2015
BE20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
LU29.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/34]AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
LU29.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/31]AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
LU29.11.2015
Former [2016/28]AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MC20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2016/24]AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SI20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2016/10]AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2016/09]AT20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
EE20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2016/07]AT20.05.2015
DK20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2015/51]AT20.05.2015
ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
BG20.08.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
IS20.09.2015
PT21.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RS20.05.2015
NO20.08.2015
GR21.08.2015
PT21.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]US5347727  (KIM SANG D [KR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004200093  (WUNDERLIN WILLIAM JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *;
 [A]EP1600549  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.