Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2334065

EP2334065 - Motion vector field retiming method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.08.2014
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2011/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Ozkalayci, Burak
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. Organize Sanayi Bolgesi
45030, Manisa / TR
 [2011/24]
Representative(s)Cayli, Hülya
Paragon Consultancy Inc. Koza Sokak No: 63/2 GOP
06540 Ankara / TR
[2011/24]
Application number, filing date10193332.301.12.2010
[2011/24]
Priority number, dateTR2009000912004.12.2009         Original published format: TR 200909120
[2011/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2334065
Date:15.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2334065
Date:30.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/01, H04N5/14
[2011/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/24]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Retimingverfahren für Bewegungsvektorfeld[2011/24]
English:Motion vector field retiming method[2011/24]
French:Procédé de recalage de champ de vecteur de mouvement[2011/24]
Examination procedure29.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/02]
15.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination10.06.2015Appeal received No.  T1709/15
07.08.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.04.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
17.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
20.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
12.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0188852  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5394196  (ROBERT PHILIPPE [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Borchert et al, "Improving motion compensated Extrapolation for Distributed Video Coding", Thirteenth Annual Conference of the Advanced School for Computing and Imaging, Heijne (NL), (200706), pages 291 - 297, URL: http://msp.ewi.tudelft.nl/content/improving-motion-compensated-extrapolation-distributed-video-coding, (20120402), XP002673639 [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ROBERT P ED - YASUDA H ET AL, "MOTION COMPENSATING INTERPOLATION CONSIDERING OCCLUDING, APPEARING AND DISAPPEARING AREAS", SIGNAL PROCESSING OF HDTV, 3. TURIN, SEPT. 4 - 6, 1991; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON HDTV AND BEYOND], AMSTERDAM, ELSEVIER, NL, (19910904), vol. WORKSHOP 4, pages 329 - 341, XP000379970 [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2007092111
 WO2007049209