EP2329984 - Travel controller for industrial vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koide, Yukikazu c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP | 02 /
Kato, Norihiko c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2011/23] | Application number, filing date | 10193515.3 | 02.12.2010 | [2011/23] | Priority number, date | JP20090276403 | 04.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009276403 | [2011/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2329984 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2329984 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60L3/12, B60L15/10, B60L11/12 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
B60K6/46 (EP,US);
B60L15/10 (EP,US);
B60L3/12 (EP,US);
B60L50/61 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W20/11 (EP,US);
B66F9/07572 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/15 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/23] | B60L3/12, B60L15/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Antriebsregler für Industriefahrzeuge | [2011/23] | English: | Travel controller for industrial vehicle | [2011/23] | French: | Contrôleur du déplacement pour un véhicule industriel | [2011/23] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 04.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2058201 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1736433 (TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI KK [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * page 2; figure 1 * * paragraph [0056] * | by applicant | JP2005298163 | JP2004357459 |