Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2326107

EP2326107 - Cochlear implant [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 14.03.2018  [2018/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cochlear Limited
1 University Avenue
Macquarie University, NSW 2109 / AU
[2014/38]
Former [2011/21]For all designated states
Cochlear Limited
14 Mars Road
Lane Cove, NSW 2066 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / Money, David
Cochlear Limited
50 Blackbutt Avenue
Pennant Hills, New South Wales NSW 2120 / AU
02 / Nygard, Tony
Cochlear Limited
14 Stacey Close
Kariong, New South Wales NSW 2250 / AU
03 / Seligman, Peter
Cochlear Limited
107 Fawkner Street
Essendon, Victoria VIC 3040 / AU
04 / Ibrahim, Ibrahim
Cochlear Limited
14 Mars Road
Lane Cove, New South Wales NSW 2066 / AU
05 / Zhang, Andy L.
Cochlear Limited
384-388 Albert Street
East Melbourne, Victoria VIC 3002 / AU
 [2016/32]
Former [2011/21]01 / Money, David
Cochlear Limited 50 Blackbutt Avenue
Pennant Hills, New South Wales NSW 2120 / AU
02 / Nygard, Tony
Cochlear Limited 14 Stacey Close
Kariong, New South Wales NSW 2250 / AU
03 / Seligman, Peter
Cochlear Limited 107 Fawkner Street
Essendon, Victoria VIC 3040 / AU
04 / Ibrahim, Ibrahim
Cochlear Limited 14 Mars Road
Lane Cove, New South Wales NSW 2066 / AU
05 / Zhang, Andy L.
Cochlear Limited 384-388 Albert Street
East Melbourne, Victoria VIC 3002 / AU
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2016/32]
Former [2011/21]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date10193532.829.06.2001
[2011/21]
Priority number, dateAU2000PQ0847730.06.2000         Original published format: AU PQ847700
AU2000PR0022519.09.2000         Original published format: AU PR022500
[2011/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2326107
Date:25.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2326107
Date:10.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04R25/00, A61N1/36
[2011/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2016/32]
Former [2011/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Cochleaimplantat[2011/21]
English:Cochlear implant[2011/21]
French:Implant cochléaire[2011/21]
Examination procedure22.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/01]
18.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2016Fee for grant paid
22.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01947026.9  / EP1304017
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010947026) is  02.12.2008
Opposition(s)11.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
18.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
18.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
18.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
18.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
18.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
14.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
GR11.11.2016
PT12.12.2016
[2018/11]
Former [2017/36]AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
GR11.11.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/12]AT10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
GR11.11.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
Former [2017/09]FI10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5814095  (MUELLER GERD [DE], et al) [Y] 1,8-15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 7-12 * * column 6, lines 20-25 * * column 8, lines 47-67 * * column 9, line 25 - column 11, line 41 * * claims 11,27 *;
 [Y]WO0032009  (INSONUS MEDICAL INC [US]) [Y] 1,8-15 * page 18, line 20 - page 21, line 7 * * page 22, line 19 - page 23, line 8 * * page 25, line 11 - page 27, line 16 * * figure - *;
 [A]US5935166  (KENNEDY JOEL A [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 5, line 32 - column 8, line 26 * * figure - *;
 [A]US6067474  (SCHULMAN JOSEPH H [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 9, line 29 - column 11, line 67 *
ExaminationUS5359321
by applicantUS4532930
 US6067474
 WO0139830
 WO9744987
 US5046242