Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2466481

EP2466481 - Single wire bus system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
[2013/48]
Former [2013/36]For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA
Former [2012/25]For all designated states
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Poulsen, Jens Kristian
295 Philip St,
Extension: 70873
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
 [2012/25]
Representative(s)Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2012/25]Moore, Barry , et al
Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane
Dublin 2 / IE
Application number, filing date10193567.402.12.2010
[2012/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2466481
Date:20.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/42
[2012/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Einzeldrahtbussystem[2012/25]
English:Single wire bus system[2012/25]
French:Système de bus à fil unique[2012/25]
Examination procedure02.12.2010Examination requested  [2012/25]
03.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
22.12.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
22.12.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination20.02.2015Appeal received No.  T0873/15
20.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.08.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2010010278  (ST MICROELECTRONICS ROUSSET [FR]; TAILLIET FRANCOIS [FR]) [X] 1-7,9,13-15 * figure 1 * * figure 2A * * figure 2B * * figure 2C * * page 1, line 17 - page 3, line 35 * [I] 8;
 [A]  - DOWNS R ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Using 1-Wire I/O for distributed system monitoring", 17TH DASC. THE AIAA/IEEE/SAE DIGITAL AVIONICS SYSTEMS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. BELLEVUE, WA, OCT. 31 - NOV. 7, 1998; [DASC. DIGITAL AVIONICS SYSTEMS CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (19980915), doi:DOI:10.1109/WESCON.1998.716439, ISBN 978-0-7803-5078-6, pages 161 - 168, XP010305393 [A] 1-9,13-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WESCON.1998.716439