Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2332735

EP2332735 - Method for forming inkjet image [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.12.2012
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Konica Minolta Holdings, Inc.
6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[2011/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Takabayashi, Toshiyuki
c/o Konica Minolta IJ Technologies, Inc.
1-Sakura-
Tokyo Tokyo 191-8511 / JP
 [2013/04]
Former [2011/24]01 / Takabayashi, Toshiyuki
c/o Konica Minolta IJ Technologies, Inc. 1-Sakura-
Tokyo Tokyo 191-8511 / JP
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/04]Gille Hrabal
Patentanwälte
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2011/24]Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos
Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date10193757.106.12.2010
[2011/24]
Priority number, dateJP2009028151011.12.2009         Original published format: JP 2009281510
[2011/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2332735
Date:15.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2332735
Date:23.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:B41M5/00, B41M7/00, C09D11/10, C09D11/00
[2012/30]
Former International [2011/24]B41M7/00, B41M5/00, C09D11/00, C09D11/10, B41J2/05
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/24]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Erstellen eines Tintenstrahldruckbilds[2011/24]
English:Method for forming inkjet image[2011/24]
French:Procédé de formation d'une image à jet d'encre[2011/24]
Examination procedure14.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/04]
16.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2012Fee for grant paid
19.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.01.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.10.2013   
Océ-Technologies B.V.
St. Urbanusweg 43
NL-5914 CC VENLO / NL
Opponent's representative
Cornelissen, Leandra
Océ-Technologies B.V.
Corporate Patents
P.O. Box 101
5900 MA Venlo / NL
 [2013/48]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
27.11.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.05.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.12.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition23.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0435/16
22.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.12.2010
AL23.01.2013
AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
MK23.01.2013
MT23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
RS23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
SM23.01.2013
TR23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
IE06.12.2013
LU06.12.2013
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2015/47]HU06.12.2010
AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
MK23.01.2013
MT23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
RS23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
SM23.01.2013
TR23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
IE06.12.2013
LU06.12.2013
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/41]HU06.12.2010
AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
MK23.01.2013
MT23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
RS23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
SM23.01.2013
TR23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
IE06.12.2013
LU06.12.2013
Former [2015/34]HU06.12.2010
AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
MK23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
RS23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
SM23.01.2013
TR23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
IE06.12.2013
LU06.12.2013
Former [2015/32]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
MK23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
RS23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
SM23.01.2013
TR23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
IE06.12.2013
LU06.12.2013
Former [2015/24]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
RS23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
SM23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
IE06.12.2013
LU06.12.2013
Former [2014/48]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
RS23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
IE06.12.2013
LU06.12.2013
Former [2014/38]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
RS23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
LU06.12.2013
Former [2014/33]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
RS23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2014/03]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
RS23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/52]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
RS23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/49]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
RS23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/48]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RS23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/43]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RS23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/41]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/40]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/38]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/37]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/36]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/35]BE23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/34]LT23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/33]LT23.01.2013
NO23.04.2013
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP1681323  (XEROX CORP [US]) [AD] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 10] - [0014] - [0 38] , [0 48]; claims 1, 10 *;
 [A]US2009225138  (WATANABE SHUNSUKE [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0003] , [00 9] , [0 10] , [0 18] - [0040] * * figure 1; claims 1-9 *;
 [A]EP1826252  (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 168] - [0172] * * claims 1-11 *;
 [XP]EP2184173  (KONICA MINOLTA IJ TECHNOLOGIES [JP]) [XP] 1-5 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 13] , [0 35] , [0 87] - [0097] - [ 115] , [ 116] * * claim 1 *
by applicantJP2009281510
 JP2006193745
 JP2009510184
 JP2008513245
 JP2001220526
 JP2001310937
 JP2005126507
 JP2005255821
    - "Imaging", YO YUKI ZAIRYO, Organic Materials Used for Imaging Applications, BUNSHIN SHUPPAN, (1993), pages 187 - 192