Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2332408

EP2332408 - Treating neurological disorders [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2014
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2014No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.10.2014  [2014/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biogen Idec MA Inc.
14 Cambridge Center
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US
[2011/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Burkly, Linda, C
34 Winthrop Street
West Newton, MA 02465 / US
02 / Hahm, Kyungmin
49 Eldred Street
Lexington, MA 02420 / US
03 / Zheng, Timothy
1723 Washington Street 309
Boston, MA 02118 / US
04 / Perrin, Steve
2 Erin's Way
Westford, MA 01886 / US
05 / Lincecum, John
44 Garland Street 1
Jamaica Plain, MA 02130 / US
 [2013/46]
Former [2011/24]01 / Burkly, Linda, C
34 Winthrop Street
West Newton, MA 02465 / US
02 / Hahm, Kyungmin
49 Eldred Street
Lexington, MA 02420 / US
03 / Zheng, Timothy
1723 Washington Street 309
Boston, MA 02118 / US
04 / Perrin, Steve
2 Erin's Way
Westford, MA 01886 / US
05 / Lincecum, John
44 Garland Street 1
Jamaica Plain, MA 02130 / US
Representative(s)Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/46]Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Former [2011/24]Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Application number, filing date10194040.117.02.2006
[2011/24]
Priority number, dateUS20050653813P17.02.2005         Original published format: US 653813 P
[2011/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2332408
Date:15.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2332408
Date:13.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:A01N37/18, A61K38/00, A61K39/395, C07K1/00, C07K14/00, C07K17/00
[2011/24]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   GB,   IE,   LI [2011/24]
TitleGerman:Behandlung neurologischer Störungen[2011/24]
English:Treating neurological disorders[2011/24]
French:Traitement de troubles neurologiques[2011/24]
Examination procedure15.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/04]
03.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
29.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.2013Fee for grant paid
04.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06720841.3  / EP1859277
Divisional application(s)EP12171177.4  / EP2529619
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060720841) is  28.05.2010
Opposition(s)14.08.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/43]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
29.11.2012Request for further processing filed
29.11.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.12.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
07.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2004074433  (UNIV YALE [US], et al) [X] 18 * see page 1, line 14 and page 2 lines 22-35. Cl.27;; claim 1 *;
 [XA]WO03086311  (BIOGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 18 * claim 1 * [A] 1-17,19
by applicantUS5223409
 US2004033225
 US6824773
 US6407213
 US5693762
 US2003070185
 US5789650
 WO9634096
 EP0239400
 US6602503
 US5693761
 WO9007861
 US5585089
 US5530101
 US5798230
 US2003232333
 US4399216
 US4634665
 US5179017
 US5648260
 US5849992
 US2003166282
 US2003143204
 US2004038278
 US2003224432
 US4987071
 US5116742
 US5093246
 US4868116
 US4980286
 WO8907136
 WO8902468
 WO8905345
 WO9207573
 US6534261
 WO0042219
 US6511808
 US6630514
 US5877399
 US6037521
 US5894078
 US5850003
 US5898094
 US5612486
 US5387742
 US5720936
 US5877015
 US5811633
 US5399163
 US5383851
 US5312335
 US5064413
 US4941880
 US4790824
 US4596556
 US4487603
 US4486194
 US4447233
 US4447224
 US4439196
 US4475196
 US5143854
 US5510270
 US5527681
 US5384261
 US5288514
 US4683202
 US4683196
 US5714320
 US5130238
 US5409818
 US5554517
 US5455166
 US4277437
 US6066457
 US6132997
 US5716785
 US5854033
 US6143495
 US5624825
 US6294336
 US6013431
 US5952174
 US6066454
    - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1989), pages 6.3.1 - 6.3.6
    - JHAVERI ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2000), vol. 18, page 1293
    - CHOTHIA, C. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917
    - A. F. WILLIAMS; A. N. BARCLAY, ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 6, pages 381 - 405
    - GREEN ET AL., NAT. GEN., (1994), vol. 7, pages 13 - 21
    - TEMPEST ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 266 - 271
    - BOEMER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, pages 86 - 95
    - PERSSON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 2432 - 2436
    - HUANG; STOLLAR, J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1991), vol. 141, pages 227 - 236
    - HOOGENBOOM ET AL., IMMUNOTECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 4, pages 1 - 20
    - HOOGENBOOM ET AL., IMMUNOL TODAY, (2000), vol. 2, pages 371 - 378
    - POWERS ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2001), vol. 251, pages 123 - 35
    - URLAUB; CHASIN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 4220
    - KAUFMAN; SHARP, MOL. BIOL., (1982), vol. 159, pages 601 - 621
    - CLEMENS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 6499 - 6503
    - BILLY ET AL., PROC. NATL. SCI. USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 14428 - 14433
    - ELBASHIR ET AL., NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, pages 494 - 498
    - YANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 9942 - 9947
    - WOOLF ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 7305 - 7309
    - HASELOFF; GERLACH, NATURE, (1988), vol. 334, pages 585 - 591
    - HELENE, C., ANTICANCER DRUG DES., (1991), vol. 6, pages 569 - 84
    - HELENE, ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1992), vol. 660, pages 27 - 36
    - MAHER, BIOASSAYS, (1992), vol. 14, pages 807 - 815
    - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, GREENE PUBLISHING ASSOCIATES, (1989), pages 9.10 - 9.14
    - EGLITIS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, pages 1395 - 1398
    - DANOS; MULLIGAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 6460 - 6464
    - WILSON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 3014 - 3018
    - ARMENTANO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD.SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 6141 - 6145
    - HUBER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI, USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 8039 - 8043
    - FERRY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 8377 - 8381
    - CHOWDHURY ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, pages 1802 - 1805
    - VAN BEUSECHEM ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 7640 - 7644
    - KAY ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1992), vol. 3, pages 641 - 647
    - DAI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10892 - 10895
    - HWU ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 150, pages 4104 - 4115
    - BERKNER ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, page 616
    - ROSENFELD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 252, pages 431 - 434
    - ROSENFELD ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 68, pages 143 - 155
    - FLOTTE ET AL., AM. J. RESPIR. CELL. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 7, pages 349 - 356
    - SAMULSKI ET AL., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 3822 - 3828
    - MCLAUGHLIN ET AL., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 62, pages 1963 - 1973
    - REBAR ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1996), vol. 267, page 129
    - GREISMAN; PABO, SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 275, page 657
    - ISALAN ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2001), vol. 19, page 656
    - WU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, page 344
    - TENG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 3024 - 3029
    - WAMIL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 13188 - 13193
    - KUHN; WRATHALL, J. NEUROTRAUMA, (1998), vol. 15, pages 125 - 40
    - ZOHAR ET AL., NEUROSCIENCE, (2003), vol. 118, pages 949 - 955
    - TU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 3155 - 3160
    - GRIEB, FOLIA NEUROPATHOL., (2004), vol. 42, pages 239 - 48
    - STORKEBAUM ET AL., NAT. NEUROSCI., (2005), vol. 8, pages 85 - 92
    - SHARP ET AL., NEUROSCIENCE, (2005), vol. 130, pages 897 - 910
    - AMENDOLA ET AL., EUR. J.NEUROSCI., (2004), vol. 20, pages 2822 - 2826
    - MASLIAH ET AL., SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 287, pages 1265 - 1269
    - MOVEMENT DISORDERS, (1996), vol. 11, pages 136 - 142
    - MARDER ET AL., NEUROLOGY, (2000), vol. 54, pages 452 - 458
    - BROUILLET, FUNCTIONAL NEUROLOGY, (2000), vol. 15, no. 4, pages 239 - 251
    - ONA ET AL., NATURE, (1999), vol. 399, pages 263 - 267
    - BATES ET AL., HUM. MOL. GENET., (1997), vol. 6, no. 10, pages 1633 - 1637
    - HANSSON ET AL., J. NEUROCHEM., (2001), vol. 78, pages 694 - 703
    - RUBINSZTEIN, TRENDS GENET., (2002), vol. 18, pages 202 - 209
    - MANGIARINI ET AL., CELL, (1996), vol. 87, pages 493 - 506
    - DAVIES ET AL., CELL, (1997), vol. 90, pages 537 - 548
    - BROUILLET, FUNCTIONAL NEUROL., (2000), vol. 15, no. 4, pages 239 - 251
    - CHA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI, USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 6480 - 6485
    - GANES ET AL., NATURE, (1995), vol. 373, page 523
    - BERGE, S.M. ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19
    - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS
    - GE, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2000), vol. 28, no. E3, pages I - VII
    - LUEKING ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1999), vol. 270, pages 103 - 111
    - MENDOZA ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1999), vol. 27, pages 778 - 788
    - MACBEATH; SCHREIBER, SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 289, pages 1760 - 1763
    - DE WILDT ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH., (2000), vol. 18, pages 989 - 994
    - GOLUB ET AL., SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 286, page 531
    - BEAUDET ET AL., GENOME RES., (2001), vol. 11, no. 4, pages 600 - 608
    - MYERS ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 313, pages 495 - 498
    - GANGULY, HUM. MUTAT., (2002), vol. 19, no. 4, pages 334 - 342
    - GIBBS ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 2437 - 2448
    - PROSSER, TRENDS BIOTECHNOL, (1993), vol. 11, pages 23 8 - 246
    - GASPARINI ET AL., MOL. CELL PROBES, (1992), vol. 6, page 1
    - BARANY, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, page 189
    - SAIKI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, pages 1350 - 1354
    - WU ET AL., GENOMICS, (1989), vol. 4, pages 560 - 569
    - BARRINGER ET AL., GENE, (1990), vol. 1989, pages 117 - 122
    - F. BARANY, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 1988, pages 189 - 193
    - SARKAR ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 331 - 334
    - STOFLER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, page 491
 WO1993US04145