Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2293230

EP2293230 - System for managing the lifecycle of a service oriented architecture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/10]Method and system for managing the lifecycle of a service oriented architecture
[2011/50]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.03.2015
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Software AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[2011/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Post, Ulrich Dr.
Tannenbergstr. 34
64342, Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE
02 / Schöning, Harald Dr.
Theobaldstr. 36
64807, Dieburg / DE
03 / Hafermann, Udo Dr.
Spitzwegpfad 5
64291, Darmstadt / DE
 [2014/19]
Former [2011/10]01 / Post, Ulrich Dr.
Tannenbergstr. 34
64342, Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE
02 / Schöning, Harald Dr.
Theobaldstr. 36
64807, Dieburg / DE
03 / Hafermann, Udo Dr.
Spitzwegpfad 5
64291, Darmstadt / DE
Representative(s)Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2014/19]
Former [2011/10]Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date10194563.211.09.2006
[2011/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2293230
Date:09.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2293230
Date:07.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00
[2011/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/10]
TitleGerman:System zur Verwaltung des Lebenszyklus einer dienstorientierten Architektur[2011/50]
English:System for managing the lifecycle of a service oriented architecture[2011/50]
French:Système de gestion du cycle de vie d'une architecture orientée service[2011/50]
Former [2011/10]Verfahren und System zur Verwaltung des Lebenszyklus einer dienstorientierten Architektur
Former [2011/10]Method and system for managing the lifecycle of a service oriented architecture
Former [2011/10]Procédé et système de gestion du cycle de vie d'une architecture orientée service
Examination procedure10.12.2010Examination requested  [2011/10]
01.02.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.07.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.09.2013
26.09.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
19.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2014Fee for grant paid
24.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06018965.1  / EP1898345
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060018965) is  29.12.2008
Opposition(s)10.02.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
20.09.2012Request for further processing filed
20.09.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.10.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
22.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
20.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
20.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.09.2006
AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
TR07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
IE11.09.2014
LU11.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
FR30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU11.09.2006
AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
IE11.09.2014
LU11.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
FR30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/25]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
IE11.09.2014
LU11.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
FR30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/38]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
IE11.09.2014
LU11.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
FR30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/37]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
IE11.09.2014
LU11.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/36]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
LU11.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/33]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
LU11.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/22]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
LU11.09.2014
Former [2015/20]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/12]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/11]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/10]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/08]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/02]AT07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2014/51]AT07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
Former [2014/47]CY07.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]  TOPOLNIK M ET AL, Implementation of the ebxml registry client for the ebxml registry services, TELECOMMUNICATIONS, 2003. CONTEL 2003. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 7TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON JUNE 11-13, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, PAGE(S) 551-556, ISBN 953-184-052-0, XP010646949 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [A]  FARRUKH NAJMI, Web Content Management Using the OASIS ebXML Registry Standard, XP002412451 [A] 1-11 * section "Features of ebXML Registry" *
 [A]  ANONYMOUS, About the OSGi Service Platform - Technical Whitepaper - Rev. 3.0, XP002367057 [A] 1-11 * Section "Key Features of the OSGi Service Platform" *
 [A]  DOGAC ET AL, "Artemis: Deploying semantically enriched Web services in the healthcare domain", INFORMATION SYSTEMS, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (200606), vol. 31, no. 4-5, ISSN 0306-4379, pages 321 - 339, XP005309407 [A] 1-11 * Section 2.7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.is.2005.02.006
 [A]  ANONYMOUS, "Web Services Made Easier, The Java APIs and Architectures for XML", INTERNET CITATION, (20011031), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20011116112311/http://java.sun.com/xml/web services.pdf, (20041124), XP002307219 [A] 1-11 * pages 19-21 *
 [A]  THOMPSON S M, "CONFIGURATION MANAGEMENT - KEEPING IT ALL TOGETHER", BT TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, SPRINGER, DORDRECHT, NL, (199707), vol. 15, no. 3, ISSN 1358-3948, pages 48 - 60, XP000722017 [A] 1-11 * Section 5.4 and 5.5 * * figure 6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1018682001890