Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2364774

EP2364774 - Microfluidic Devices And Methods Of Use In The Formation And Control Of Nanoreactors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc.
1000 Alfred Nobel Drive
Hercules, CA 94547 / US
[2019/31]
Former [2011/37]For all designated states
Raindance Technologies, Inc.
530 Whitfield Street
Guilford, CT 06437 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LINK, Darren, R.
8 Buckman Drive
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
02 / BOITARD, Laurent
33 Seaside Avenue
Guilford, CT CT 06437 / US
03 / BRANCIFORTE, Jeffrey
11 Diane Drive
Cromwell, CT CT 06416 / US
04 / CHARLES, Yves
217 Lincoln Street
Waterbury, CT CT 06710 / US
05 / FEKE, Gilbert
15 Park Place
Durham CT 06422 / US
06 / LU, John, Q.
4316 Belvedere Drive
Plano TX 75093 / US
07 / MARRAN, David
55 Clark Road
Durham, CT CT 06422 / US
08 / TABATABAI, Ahmadali
155 Peddlers Drive
Branford, CT CT 06405 / US
09 / WEINER, Michael
52 Leighton Trail
Guilford, CT CT 06437 / US
10 / HINZ, Wolfgang
530 Whitfield Street
Guilford, CT CT 06437 / US
11 / ROTHBERG, Jonathan, M.
530 Whitfield Street
Guilford, CT CT 06437 / US
 [2011/37]
Representative(s)Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew
Graham Watt & Co. LLP
St. Botolph's House
7-9 St. Botolph's Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/37]Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew , et al
Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
Application number, filing date10196179.501.06.2006
[2011/37]
Priority number, dateUS20060763524P30.01.2006         Original published format: US 763524 P
US20060771286P07.02.2006         Original published format: US 771286 P
WO2006US0093111.01.2006         Original published format: PCT/US2006/000931
[2011/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2364774
Date:14.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2364774
Date:04.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:B01J19/00, G01N35/08, B01L3/00
[2011/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Mikrofluidische Vorrichtungen Und Verfahren Zur Verwendung Bei Der Bildung Und Kontrolle Von Nanoreaktoren[2011/37]
English:Microfluidic Devices And Methods Of Use In The Formation And Control Of Nanoreactors[2011/37]
French:Dispositifs Microfluidiques Et Leurs Procédés D'utilisation Dans La Formation Et Le Contrôle De Nanoréacteurs[2011/37]
Examination procedure04.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/03]
16.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06844121.1  / EP1984738
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
26.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
29.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006003439  (ISMAGILOV RUSTEM F [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * paragraphs [0028] - [0175]; figures 1-18 *;
 [X]US2005202489  (CHO YOON-KYOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2005221339  (GRIFFITHS ANDREW [GB], et al) [X] 1-23 * paragraphs [0176] - [0343]; figures 1-27 *;
 [X]US2005272159  (ISMAGILOV RUSTEM F [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2005032240  (LEE ABRAHAM PHILLIP [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * paragraphs [0045] - [0048]; figure 3 *;
 [X]WO2005002730  (UNIV MANCHESTER [GB], et al) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2005059512  (UNIV NORTHEASTERN [US], et al) [X] 1,21,23 * page 25 - page 26; figure 5 *;
 [X]  - DITTRICH PETRA S ET AL, "A new embedded process for compartmentalized cell-free protein expression and on-line detection in microfluidic devices", CHEMBIOCHEM - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, WILEY VCH, WEINHEIM, DE, (20050501), vol. 6, no. 5, doi:10.1002/CBIC.200400321, ISSN 1439-4227, pages 811 - 814, XP002376055 [X] 1,21,23 * page 812 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cbic.200400321
 [A]  - OKUSHIMA SHINGO ET AL, "Controlled production of monodisperse double emulsions by two-step droplet breakup in microfluidic devices", LANGMUIR, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, NEW YORK, NY; US, (20041109), vol. 20, no. 23, doi:10.1021/LA0480336, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 9905 - 9908, XP002376054 [A] 1,21,23 * page 9905 - page 9908 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la0480336
by applicantWO0189788
 US5523162
 US5656155
 US5454472
 US6540895
 US2001029983
 US2005226742
    - WHITESIDES; XIA, ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (1998), vol. 37, page 550
    - FULWYER, SCIENCE, (1974), vol. 156, page 910
    - LI; HARRISON, ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 69, page 1564
    - FIEDLER ET AL., ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 70, pages 1909 - 1915
    - FIEDLER ET AL., ANALYTICAL CHEMISTLY, (1998), vol. 70, pages 1909 - 1915
    - FIEDLER ET AL., ANALYTICAL CHERNISTFY, (1998), vol. 70, pages 1909 - 1915
    - SEETHALA R; MENZEL R., "A Homogeneous, Fluorescence Polarization Assay for Src-Family Tyrosine Kinases", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (199711), vol. 253, no. 2, pages 210 - 218
    - ALLEN M; REEVES J; MELLOR G., "High throughput fluorescence polarization: a homogeneous alternative to radioligand binding for cell surface receptors", J BIOMOL SCREEN., (200004), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 63 - 9
    - S.B. TENCZA ET AL., "Development of a Fluorescence Polarization-Based Diagnostic Assay for Equine Infectious Anemia Virus", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (200005), vol. 38, no. 5, pages 1854 - 1859
    - SEETHALA R.; MENZEL R., "A Homogeneous, Fluorescence Polarization Assay for Src-Family Tyrosine Kinases", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (199711), vol. 253, no. 2, pages 210 - 218
    - J BIOMOL SCREEN., (200004), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 63 - 9
 US20010814338
 US20020428002
 US20040767899
 US20050045678
 US20050195254