Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2469797

EP2469797 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SECURE COMPLEX EVENT PROCESSING IN HETEROGENEOUS ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2012/26]System and method for secure complex event processing in heterogeneous environments
[2018/33]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.12.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.12.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 30.01.2019  [2019/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Software AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[2012/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Gesmann, Michael
Gersprenzweg 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
02 / Schöning, Harald, Dr.
Theobaldstrasse 36
61807 Dieburg / DE
03 / Harbarth, Juliane
Groß-Gerauer-Strasse 50a
64347 Griesheim / DE
04 / Weber, Heiko
Bergstrasse 106A
61319 Pfungstadt / DE
 [2012/26]
Representative(s)Wegner, Hans , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
[2019/05]
Former [2012/26]Bardehle, Heinz
Bardehle Pagenberg
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date10196788.323.12.2010
[2012/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2469797
Date:27.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2469797
Date:30.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/62, H04L29/06
[2018/30]
Former International [2012/26]H04L29/08, G06F17/30, H04L29/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/26]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SICHEREN KOMPLEXEN EREIGNISVERARBEITUNG IN HETEROGENEN UMGEBUNGEN[2018/33]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SECURE COMPLEX EVENT PROCESSING IN HETEROGENEOUS ENVIRONMENTS[2018/33]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'ÉVÉNEMENT COMPLEXE SÉCURISÉ DANS DES ENVIRONNEMENTS HÉTÉROGÈNES[2018/33]
Former [2012/26]System und Verfahren zur sicheren komplexen Ereignisverarbeitung in heterogenen Umgebungen
Former [2012/26]System and method for secure complex event processing in heterogeneous environments
Former [2012/26]Système et procédé de traitement d'événement complexe sécurisé dans des environnements hétérogènes
Examination procedure23.12.2010Examination requested  [2012/26]
22.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2018Fee for grant paid
26.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.06.2015
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
22.01.2013Request for further processing filed
22.01.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.02.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]US2010125562  (NAIR RAHUL [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 3,5,6,12 * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0244] - paragraph [0263] * * paragraph [0392] * * paragraph [0475] * * paragraph [0480] *
by applicant   - VAN ELST ET AL., BUSINESS REGISTER INTEROPERABILITY THROUGHOUT EUROPE: THE BRITE PROJECT, URL: http://citeseerx.ist.psu.edu/viewdoc/download?doi=10.1.1.68.446&rep =rep1&type=pdf