blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2469797 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2469797



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 228
11.02.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.11.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.11.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
26.11.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
26.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.07.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.07.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
16.07.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.07.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
16.07.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 24
01.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
01.06.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
01.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.06.2018 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
01.06.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
29.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.05.2018 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.04.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
29.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.03.2018 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.11.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
21.11.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
13.11.2015 Claims Search / examination 4
13.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 19
13.11.2015 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 16
13.11.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
29.10.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
21.10.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.06.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.06.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
11.06.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.06.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
08.06.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
04.05.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
23.02.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
31.07.2014 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.07.2014 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
11.11.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
06.02.2013 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
22.01.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
22.01.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
22.01.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
22.01.2013 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
14.12.2012 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
07.08.2012 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.07.2012 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
31.05.2012 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
02.08.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.07.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.07.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 3
07.07.2011 European search report Search / examination 2
23.12.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.12.2010 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
23.12.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
23.12.2010 Description Search / examination 17
23.12.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.12.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.12.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.12.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.12.2010 Drawings Search / examination 1
23.12.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4