blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2469797


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019 [2019/39]
16.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2019 [2019/38]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019 [2019/37]
26.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2019 [2019/35]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
12.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
30.12.2018 (Expected) grant published on  30.01.2019  [2019/05]
21.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.11.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
29.11.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
27.11.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
15.07.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.07.2018 Change - German title published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
13.07.2018 Change - English title published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
13.07.2018 Change - French title published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
22.06.2018 Change - classification published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
22.06.2018 Change - classification published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
01.06.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
30.03.2018 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.12.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.11.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.10.2015 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.06.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.06.2015 Change - representative
12.06.2015 First examination report
29.04.2015 Change - representative
13.03.2015 Change - representative
05.03.2015 Change - representative
06.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.01.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.02.2013 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
29.01.2013 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
28.01.2013 Amendment by applicant
28.01.2013 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
04.01.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.06.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.06.2012  [2012/26]
25.05.2012 Request for examination filed published on  27.06.2012  [2012/26]