blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2469797
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US8266351Global Dossier 11.09.2012B2
US2012166688 28.06.2012A1
Priority number Date
EP10196788 23.12.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2469797Global Dossier 30.01.2019B1
EP2469797 27.06.2012A1
Priority number Date
EP10196788 23.12.2010