Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2319972

EP2319972 - Household appliance for treating soft goods with displacement sensor and method for measuring the weight of loaded soft goods [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/19]Household appliance for treating soft goods with displacement sensor
[2013/28]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.10.2013
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
25.06.2019Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A.
Via Carlo Pisacane nº 1
20016 Pero (MI) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2017/07]For all designated states
Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A
Via Carlo Pisacane nº 1
20016 Pero (MI) / IT
Former [2011/19]For all designated states
Indesit Company S.p.A.
Viale Aristide Merloni, 47
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Aisa, Valerio
Via Serraloggia, 78/A
60044 Fabriano / IT
02 / Baldelli, Roberto
Piazza Diaz 5
60123 Ancona / IT
03 / Burzella, Luciano
Indesit Company S.p.A.
Via Don Crocetti, 34
60044 Fabriano / IT
04 / Minni, Federica
Indesit Company S.p.A.
Via Sicilia, 8A
60015 Falconara Marittima / IT
05 / Concettoni, Fabrizio
Via dei Lecci, 10
60034 Cupramontana / IT
06 / Animobono, Valeria
Indesit Company S.p.A.
Via Pietro Nenni, 31
60044 Fabriano / IT
 [2013/46]
Former [2011/40]01 / Aisa, Valerio
Via Serraloggia, 78/A
I-60044, Fabriano / IT
02 / Baldelli, Roberto
Piazza Diaz 5
60123, Ancona / IT
03 / Burzella, Luciano
Indesit Company S.p.A.
Via Don Crocetti 34
60044, Fabriano (AN) / IT
04 / Minni, Federica
Indesit Company S.p.A.
Via Sicilia, 8A
60015, Falconara Marittima (AN) / IT
05 / Concettoni, Fabrizio
Via dei Lecci 10
60034 Cupramontana (AN) / IT
06 / Animobono, Valeria
Indesit Company S.p.A.
Via Pietro Nenni 31
60044, Fabriano (AN) / IT
Former [2011/19]01 / Aisa, Valerio
Via Serraloggia, 78/A
I-60044, Fabriano / IT
02 / Baldelli, Roberto
Piazza Diaz 5
60123, Ancona / IT
03 / Burzella, Luciano
Indesit Company S.p.A. Via Don Crocetti 34
60044, Fabriano (AN) / IT
04 / Minni, Federica
Indesit Company S.p.A. Via Sicilia, 8A
60015, Falconara Marittima (AN) / IT
05 / Concettoni, Fabrizio
Indesit Company S.p.A. Piazza Pertini 20
60033, Chiaravalle (AN) / IT
06 / Animobono, Valeria
Indesit Company S.p.A. Via Pietro Nenni 31
60044, Fabriano (AN) / IT
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/47]Santonicola, Paolo
Indesit Company S.p.A. Via Lamberto Corsi, 55
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
Former [2011/19]Santonicola, Paolo
Indesit Company S.p.A. Via Lamberto Corsi, 55
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
Application number, filing date10196804.826.07.2007
[2011/19]
Priority number, dateIT2006TO0055126.07.2006         Original published format: IT TO20060551
[2011/19]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2319972
Date:11.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2319972
Date:20.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:D06F37/20
[2011/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/19]
TitleGerman:Haushaltsgerät zur Verarbeitung von Textilien mit Versetzungssensor und Verfahren zur Messung des Gewichts von weichen beladenen Artikeln[2013/28]
English:Household appliance for treating soft goods with displacement sensor and method for measuring the weight of loaded soft goods[2013/28]
French:Appareil électroménager permettant de traiter materiaux souples avec capteur de déplacement et méthode pour mesurer le poids d' articles souples chargés[2013/28]
Former [2011/19]Haushaltsgerät zur Verarbeitung von Textilien mit Versetzungssensor
Former [2011/19]Household appliance for treating soft goods with displacement sensor
Former [2011/19]Appareil électroménager permettant de traiter materiaux souples avec capteur de déplacement
Examination procedure11.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.11.2011Examination requested  [2011/51]
20.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2012Observations by third parties
22.05.2012Observations by third parties
26.09.2012Observations by third parties
05.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.2013Fee for grant paid
09.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07825005.7  / EP2087160
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070825005) is  06.08.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.08.2014  21.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
SCHURACK, Eduard
Balanstr. 57
D-81541 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
PartG mbB
Balanstrasse 57
81541 München / DE
 [2014/39]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
24.09.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.03.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.04.2015Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
08.06.2015Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
08.09.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.09.2016
13.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
27.10.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition14.12.2016Appeal received No.  T2672/16
03.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
21.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
16.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.07.2007
AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
MT20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE26.07.2014
LU26.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
SI27.07.2016
[2017/37]
Former [2016/32]HU26.07.2007
AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
MT20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE26.07.2014
LU26.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/31]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
MT20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE26.07.2014
LU26.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/28]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
MT20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE26.07.2014
LU26.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/25]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE26.07.2014
LU26.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/21]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE26.07.2014
LU26.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/37]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE26.07.2014
LU26.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/20]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
LU26.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/13]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
LU26.07.2014
Former [2014/41]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/37]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/36]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/28]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/26]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
Former [2014/25]AT20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
Former [2014/24]AT20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
Former [2014/23]FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
Former [2014/22]FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
Former [2014/20]LT20.11.2013
Documents cited:Search[YD]EP1094239  (SUSPA HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [YD] 2-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0019]; figures 1-6 *;
 [YD]DE4319614  (BAUKNECHT HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [YD] 2-15 * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 64; figures 1-3 *;
 [YD]EP1220961  (SUSPA HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [YD] 2-15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1-12 *;
 [Y]JPH09313777  (NIPPON KENTETSU CO LTD, et al) [Y] 2-15 * abstract *
by applicantDE4319614
 EP1220961
 EP1094239
 EP0654140
otherJPH0531784U
 JPH0531784K
 JPH06246087
 JPH06246087K
 JPH0584382
 JPH0584382K
 JPH0526086U
 JPH0526086K
 JPH09313777
 EP1094239