Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2472867

EP2472867 - Coding and decoding of multiview videos [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  08.11.2019
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 11.12.2019  [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Advanced Digital Broadcast S.A.
Avenue de Tournay 7
1292 Chambesy / CH
[2012/27]
Inventor(s)01 / Paczkowski, Jacek
Trasa Polnocna 16
65-119, Zielona Góra / PL
 [2012/27]
Representative(s)Borsano, Corrado , et al
Metroconsult S.r.l.
Foro Buonaparte, 51
20121 Milano / IT
[2012/47]
Former [2012/27]Di Bernardo, Antonio , et al
Metroconsult S.r.l. Via Foro Buonaparte, 51
20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date10197420.230.12.2010
[2012/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2472867
Date:04.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/26, G06T3/40
[2012/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Codierung und Decodierung von Mehrfachansichtsvideos[2012/27]
English:Coding and decoding of multiview videos[2012/27]
French:Codage et décodage de vidéos à vues multiples[2012/27]
Examination procedure22.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/27]
23.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2013Date of oral proceedings
29.07.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
30.07.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/50]
11.09.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/50]
Appeal following examination09.10.2013Appeal received No.  T0052/14
09.12.2013Statement of grounds filed
11.09.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
11.09.2019Date of oral proceedings
16.09.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.04.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
29.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201607   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - NI QIN ET AL, "On-demand sharing of a high-resolution panorama video from networked robotic cameras", INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS, 2007. IROS 2007. IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20071029), ISBN 978-1-4244-0911-2, pages 3113 - 3118, XP031222254 [X] 1,2,6-9,11-14 * page 3314, column rc; figure 1 * [I] 3-5,10
 [XI]  - CHAN S-C ET AL, "Data Compression and Transmission Aspects of Panoramic Videos", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20050101), vol. 15, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1109/TCSVT.2004.839989, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 82 - 95, XP011124668 [X] 1,2,6-9,11-14 * page 85, column rc - page 86, column lc; figures 5,7,8 * [I] 3-5,10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2004.839989
 [XI]  - CHAN S-C ET AL, "A Virtual Reality System Using the Concentric Mosaic: Construction, Rendering, and Data Compression", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MULTIMEDIA, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20050201), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1109/TMM.2005.843338, ISSN 1520-9210, pages 85 - 95, XP011125465 [X] 1,2,6-9,11-14 * page 89, column rc - page 90, column lc; figure 10 * [I] 3-5,10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMM.2005.843338
by applicant   - ISHFAQ AHMAD, "Multiview Video: Get Ready for Next-Generation Television", IEEE DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS ONLINE, (2007), vol. 8, no. 3