Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2289473

EP2289473 - Aborbent article including absorbent core having a plurality of first regions and a second region having differnt basis weight surrounding each of the first regions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.08.2016
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.09.2016  [2016/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johnson & Johnson Industria e Comercio Ltda.
Rodovia Presidente Dutra, KM-154 San Jose dos Campos CEP
12237-350 Sao Paulo / BR
[2011/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Ribeiro de Carvalho, Antonio Carlos
Praca Oito de Maio, 54 apto 21A
Taubate Sao Paulo 12020-260 / BR
02 / Caldas Salles, Maria Marcia R.
Rua Coronel Joao Cursino, 130 apto 94
San Jose dos Campos Sao Paulo 12243-680 / BR
03 / Teixeira Fajolli, Marcia Helena
Rua Francisco Martins Feitosa, 235 Casa 11, Vila Lavinea
Mog das Cruzes Sao Paulo 08735-420 / BR
 [2011/09]
Representative(s)Kirsch, Susan Edith
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/09]Kirsch, Susan Edith
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date10251391.804.08.2010
[2011/09]
Priority number, dateUS2009053575205.08.2009         Original published format: US 535752
[2011/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2289473
Date:02.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2289473
Date:16.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15
[2011/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Absorptionsfähiger Artikel, der einen absorptionsfähigen Kern mit mehreren ersten Bereichen und einem zweiten Bereich mit unterschiedlichen Flächengewicht, der jeden der ersten Bereiche umgibt, beinhaltet[2011/09]
English:Aborbent article including absorbent core having a plurality of first regions and a second region having differnt basis weight surrounding each of the first regions[2011/09]
French:Article absorbant incluant un cýur absorbant doté d'une pluralité de premières régions et d'une deuxième région, avec un poids de base different, entourant chacune des premières régions[2011/09]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
17.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/38]
22.04.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US4027672  (KARAMI HAMZEH) [X] 1,3,7,8,13-15 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 28; figures 1-5B * * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 22 *;
 [X]US6037518  (GUIDOTTI TED [SE], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9-11,13-15 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 11; figures 8-9 * * column 5, line 36 - column 6, line 5 * * column 6, lines 34-51 *;
 [X]WO0135886  (BKI HOLDING CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-15 * page 9, lines 7-17; figures 1,4h * * page 10, lines 13-15 * * page 16, line 6 - page 17, line 2 * * page 17, lines 16-19 * * page 19, line 20 - page 21, line 8 * * page 22, line 15 - page 23, line 12 * * page 24, line 21 - page 25, line 4 * * page 27, lines 5-13 * * page 28, lines 11-7 * * page 36, lines 14-23 * * page 37, lines 14-17 * * page 52, line 19 - page 53, line 2 * * page 55, line 15 - page 74, line 11; claims 1-3, 7, 19-25, 30, 38 *;
 [XP]WO2010015053  (JOHNSON & JOHNSON IND LTDA [BR], et al) [XP] 1-15 * page 1, line 1 - page 21, line 2; figures 1-24; claims 1-12 *
by applicantUS4555430
 US5916670
 US4687478
 US4589876
 US4900320
 US4608047