Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2375455

EP2375455 - Voltage matched multijunction solar cell [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.11.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, CH, GB, LI, SI
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Saint-Augustin Canada Electric Inc.
75 Rue d'Anvers
Saint-Augustin de Desmaures, Québec G3A 1S5 / CA
[2019/02]
Former [2017/23]For all designated states
Saint-Augustin Canada Electric Inc.
75 Rue d'Anvers
Saint-Augustin de Desmaures, Québec G3A 1S5 / CA
Former [2012/19]For all designated states
Soitec
Parc Technologique des Fontaines
Chemin des Franques
38190 Bernin / FR
Former [2011/41]For all designated states
S.O.I.Tec Silicon on Insulator Technologies
Parc Technologique des Fontaines, Chemin des Franques
38926 Bernin / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Gombert, Andreas
Heinrich-Mann-Strasse 5
79100 Freiburg / DE
02 / Van Riesen, Sacha
Sundgauallee 67
79114 Freiburg / DE
 [2011/41]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/02]
Former [2011/41]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date10290190.709.04.2010
[2011/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2375455
Date:12.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2375455
Date:09.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/052, H01L31/076
[2018/18]
Former International [2011/41]H01L31/052, H01L31/075
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/02]
Former [2011/41]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Mehrfachsolarzelle mit spannungsangepassten Teilzellen[2018/33]
English:Voltage matched multijunction solar cell[2011/41]
French:Cellule solaire multi-jonctions à correspondance de tension[2011/41]
Former [2011/41]Spannungsangepasste Multiverbindungssolarzelle
Examination procedure15.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/13]
17.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2018Fee for grant paid
30.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.08.2017
Opposition(s)10.10.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
24.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
25.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
26.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
25.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SI09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
SM09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
GB09.04.2019
LU09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
BE30.04.2019
CH30.04.2019
LI30.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
[2020/11]
Former [2020/04]AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
SM09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
LU09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2020/02]AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
SM09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/52]AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
SM09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/49]AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/48]AT09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/46]AT09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/39]FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/38]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/37]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/35]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL09.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]US4948436  (JUERGENS WILFRIED [DE]) [X] 1-6,9,13,14 * column 3, line 48 - column 6, line 22; figures 1-3 * [I] 15;
 [XI]US5118361  (FRAAS LEWIS M [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,5,9,12 * column 3, lines 46-61 * * column 3, lines 7-40 * * column 6, lines 17-51 * * column 7, lines 24-44; figures 1-3,7,8 * [I] 7,8,10,11;
 [X]EP1962331  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-3,5,9,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0046] - [0061] - [0065] - [0069]; figures 5,6 *;
 [X]JPS60160673  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-3,5,6,13 * abstract *;
 [XA]JPS56148874  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,3,6 * abstract * [A] 10;
 [XA]US5071490  (YOKOTA AKITOSHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,3,6,9,13 * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 8 * * column 7, lines 3-35; figures 1,3 * [A] 15