Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2428747

EP2428747 - Heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.11.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
26.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAHLE Behr GmbH & Co. KG
Mauserstrasse 3
70469 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Mahle Behr France Rouffach S.A.S.
5, avenue de la Gare
68250 Rouffach / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/22]For all designated states
MAHLE Behr GmbH & Co. KG
Mauserstrasse 3
70469 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Mahle Behr France Rouffach S.A.S
5, avenue de la Gare
68250 Rouffach / FR
Former [2015/13]For all designated states
MAHLE Behr GmbH & Co. KG
Mauserstrasse 3
70469 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Behr France Rouffach SAS
5, Avenue de la Gare
68250 Rouffach / FR
Former [2012/11]For all designated states
Behr GmbH & Co. KG
Mauserstr. 3
70469 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Behr France Rouffach SAS
5, Avenue de la Gare
68250 Rouffach / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Clauss, Thierry
45 route du Rhin
67400 Illkirch-Graffenstaden / FR
02 / Kohl, Michael Dipl.-Ing.
Südstrasse 23
74321 Bietigheim / DE
03 / Spranger, Thomas
Bockelstrasse 92d
70619 Stuttgart / DE
04 / Krumbach, Karl-Gerd Dipl.-Ing. (FH)
Fliederweg 5
71576 Burgstetten / DE
 [2012/11]
Representative(s)Grauel, Andreas , et al
Grauel IP
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Wartbergstrasse 14
70191 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/11]Grauel, Andreas , et al
Grauel IP
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Presselstrasse 10
70191 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date10290485.113.09.2010
[2012/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2428747
Date:14.03.2012
Language:DE
[2012/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2428747
Date:08.04.2015
Language:DE
[2015/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:B60H1/22, F24H9/18, F24H3/04
[2014/47]
Former International [2012/11]F24H3/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/11]
TitleGerman:Wärmeübertrager[2012/11]
English:Heat exchanger[2012/11]
French:Echangeur de chaleur[2012/11]
Examination procedure14.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.09.2012Examination requested  [2012/43]
23.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2015Fee for grant paid
24.02.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.02.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.10.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.01.2016   
Eberspächer catem GmbH & Co. KG
Gewerbepark West 16
76863 Herxheim bei Landau / DE
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 [2016/07]
16.02.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.08.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
17.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.11.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition18.12.2017Appeal received No.  T2784/17
26.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
07.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.09.2010
AL08.04.2015
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MK08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
SM08.04.2015
TR08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
AT13.09.2015
GB13.09.2015
IE13.09.2015
LU13.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU13.09.2010
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MK08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
SM08.04.2015
TR08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
AT13.09.2015
GB13.09.2015
IE13.09.2015
LU13.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2017/38]HU13.09.2010
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
SM08.04.2015
TR08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
AT13.09.2015
GB13.09.2015
IE13.09.2015
LU13.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2017/17]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
AT13.09.2015
GB13.09.2015
IE13.09.2015
LU13.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2016/34]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
GB13.09.2015
IE13.09.2015
LU13.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2016/33]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
IE13.09.2015
LU13.09.2015
CH30.09.2015
LI30.09.2015
Former [2016/24]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
LU13.09.2015
Former [2016/23]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
LU13.09.2015
Former [2016/21]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
LU13.09.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/09]DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/07]DK08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/50]ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/49]ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL08.04.2015
Documents cited:Search[XAI]JP2007298241  (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP) [X] 1,2,5,8-10,12-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0137] * [A] 4,6 [I] 3,7,11;
 [I]EP1872986  (CATEM GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [I] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] - [0028] *
by applicantUS4327282
 EP1768458
OppositionEP1872986
 JP2007298241
 DE10208103
 EP1768457
 DE19642442
 DE3208802
 EP2017548
 US2008173637
 DE8503272U
 EP2190258