blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2378330

EP2378330 - An optical filter or multiplexer/demultiplexer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  01.04.2016
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.2016Refusal of applicationpublished on 04.05.2016  [2016/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
[2014/34]
Former [2012/08]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
3 avenue Octave Gréard
75007 Paris / FR
Former [2011/42]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54, rue la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Doerr, Christopher
Alcatel-Lucent USA
L-115 791 HOLMDEL-KEYPORT RD
HOLMDEL, NJ 07733 / US
 [2011/42]
Representative(s)Shamsaei Far, Hassan, et al
Alcatel-Lucent International
Patent Business
Site Nokia Paris Saclay
Route de Villejust
91620 Nozay / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/10]Shamsaei Far, Hassan, et al
Alcatel-Lucent International
32, avenue Kléber
92700 Colombes / FR
Former [2011/42]Shamsaei Far, Hassan
Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date10305335.131.03.2010
[2011/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2378330
Date:19.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.2010
ClassificationIPC:G02B6/293, G02B6/12
[2011/42]
CPC:
G02B6/12007 (EP,US); G02B6/293 (KR); G02B6/12 (KR,US);
G02B6/10 (US); G02B6/12011 (EP,US); G02B6/29352 (EP,US);
G02B6/29398 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/42]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Optischer Filter oder Multiplexer/Demultiplexer[2011/42]
English:An optical filter or multiplexer/demultiplexer[2011/42]
French:Filtre optique ou multiplexeur/démultiplexeur[2011/42]
Examination procedure19.04.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.04.2012Examination requested  [2012/22]
01.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2015Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/18]
24.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
18.12.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
21.12.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/18]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.10.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Executiondeleted
[2014/47]
Former [2013/40]ID:01
For:AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
Date:10.04.2013
[2014/47]
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2002154846  (NOLAN DANIEL A [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,9-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0069] * [I] 2,3,7,8;
 [XAI]EP1640754  (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [X] 1,5,7-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] , [0009] , [0021] * [A] 4,6[I] 2,3
by applicant   - M. UENUMA; T. MOOOKA, "Temperature-independent silicon waveguide optical filter", OPT. LETT., (2009), vol. 34, pages 599 - 601
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.