blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2287401

EP2287401 - Befestigungsvorrichtung von Halbweichen-Blöcken oder von Herzstücken auf deren Unterstützung [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/08]Fixation device of blocs of semi-switches or frogs on their support
[2013/34]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.10.2015
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vossloh Cogifer (Société Anonyme)
54 Avenue Victor Hugo
92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR
[2011/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Mugg, Philippe
16 rue du Château Fiat
67500, Haguenau / FR
 [2014/48]
Former [2011/08]01 / Mugg, Philippe
16 rue du Château Fiat
67500, Haguenau / FR
Representative(s)Nuss, Laurent, et al
Laurent Nuss Conseil
12, rue Theophile Schuler
67000 Strasbourg / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Nuss, Laurent, et al
Cabinet Nuss
10, rue Jacques Kablé
67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR
Former [2014/09]Nuss, Laurent, et al
Cabinet Nuss 10 Rue Jacques Kablé
67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR
Former [2014/08]Ziegler, Stefan Michael, et al
Cabinet Nuss 10 Rue Jacques Kablé
67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR
Former [2011/08]Nuss, Pierre, et al
Cabinet Nuss 10 Rue Jacques Kablé
67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date10305812.922.07.2010
[2011/08]
Priority number, dateFR2009005542231.07.2009         Original published format: FR 0955422
[2011/08]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2287401
Date:23.02.2011
Language:FR
[2011/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2287401
Date:01.08.2012
Language:FR
[2012/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2287401
Date:26.11.2014
Language:FR
[2014/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.2012
ClassificationIPC:E01B7/22, E01B21/04, E01B9/66
[2012/31]
CPC:
E01B21/04 (EP); E01B7/22 (EP); E01B9/66 (EP)
Former IPC [2011/08]E01B7/22, E01B21/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/08]
TitleGerman:Fixation device of blocs of semi-switches or frogs on their support[2013/34]
English:Befestigungsvorrichtung von Halbweichen-Blöcken oder von Herzstücken auf deren Unterstützung[2013/34]
French:Ensemble de fixation des blocs de demi-aiguillages ou de coeurs d'appareil de voie sur leur support[2011/08]
Former [2011/08]Befestigungsvorrichtung von Halbweichen-Blöcken oder von Herzstücken auf deren Unterstützung
Former [2011/08]Fixation device of blocs of semi-switches or frogs on their support
Examination procedure23.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/10]
27.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
27.03.2014Fee for grant paid
27.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.11.2013
Opposition(s)27.08.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.07.2010
AL26.11.2014
AT26.11.2014
BG26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MK26.11.2014
MT26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SI26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
SM26.11.2014
TR26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU22.07.2010
AT26.11.2014
BG26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MK26.11.2014
MT26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SI26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
SM26.11.2014
TR26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2017/39]HU22.07.2010
AT26.11.2014
BG26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MT26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SI26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
SM26.11.2014
TR26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2017/21]AT26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MT26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SI26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2016/12]AT26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SI26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/37]AT26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/36]AT26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/35]AT26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/26]AT26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/25]AT26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/24]ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/23]ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/22]LT26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/21]LT26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
Former [2015/20]LT26.11.2014
Documents cited:Search[AD]FR2865225  (VOSSLOH COGIFER [FR], et al) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102005044787  (SCHRECK MIEVES GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantFR2865225
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.