Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2469222

EP2469222 - Method for analyzing at least a cutting emerging from a well, and associated apparatus. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.05.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.06.2013  [2013/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Geoservices Equipements
127, avenue du Bois de la Pie Paris Nord II
95700 Roissy en France / FR
[2012/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Kimour, Farouk
127, avenue du Bois de la Pie Paris Nord II
PB 67049
95971 Roissy en France / FR
02 / Ligneul, Patrice
9, rue Jean-Jaurès
92370 Chaville / FR
 [2013/03]
Former [2012/43]01 / Karoum, Reda
20 rue Paul Cezanne
97320 Thiais / FR
02 / Ligneul, Patrice
9, rue Jean-Jaurès
92370 Chaville / FR
Representative(s)Gabriel, Franck
Etudes et Productions Schlumberger
1 Rue Henri Becquerel
92142 Clamant Cedex / FR
[2012/26]
Application number, filing date10306505.823.12.2010
[2012/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2469222
Date:27.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:G01B11/02, G01B11/06, E21B21/06
[2012/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/26]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Analyse von mindestens einem Ausschnitt aus einem Bohrloch und zugehörige Vorrichtung[2012/26]
English:Method for analyzing at least a cutting emerging from a well, and associated apparatus.[2012/26]
French:Procédé pour analyser au moins une coupe émergeant d'un puits et appareil correspondant[2012/26]
Examination procedure03.01.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/25]
06.02.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2013/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]US3804523  (MC CORMACK H) [X] 11,12 * column 3, lines 11-27 * * abstract * [I] 1-10;
 [XI]US2004179210  (BLAESING-BANGERT CAROLA [DE] ET AL) [X] 11,12 * paragraph [0022] * * figure 1; claim 1 * [I] 1-10;
 [XI]US5485082  (WISSPEINTNER KARL [DE] ET AL) [X] 11 * column 6, lines 5-21 * * figure 2 * [I] 1,6-10;
 [A]US6233966  (DELPUECH BERNARD [FR] ET AL) [A] 4 * figures 1-4 * * column 6, line 34 - column 7, line 41 *;
 [A]WO2009105469  (MI LLC [US]; DOMAN AARON A [US]; GARBER JAKE M [US]; HERRERA PHILIP E) [A] 1,11 * claims 1,13 *
by applicant   - METHOD GEOLOGY. MECH. APPL. MAT., (1956), vol. 9, pages 313 - 319