Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2249442

EP2249442 - Retaining profile for an electrical appliance and installation having this retaining profile [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.05.2014
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
V.D.P.
21 Rue Pleyel
93200 Saint Denis / FR
[2010/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Champagne, Benjamin
60 rue de Funas
38300 Bourgoin-Jallieu / FR
 [2010/45]
Representative(s)Hecké, Gérard , et al
Cabinet Hecké
10, rue d'Arménie - Europole
BP 1537
38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/45]Hecké, Gérard , et al
Cabinet Hecké 10 rue d'Arménie - Europole BP 1537
38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR
Application number, filing date10354018.304.05.2010
[2010/45]
Priority number, dateFR2009000218506.05.2009         Original published format: FR 0902185
[2010/45]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2249442
Date:10.11.2010
Language:FR
[2010/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2249442
Date:10.07.2013
Language:FR
[2013/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:H01R25/14, // H01R13/24
[2010/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/45]
TitleGerman:Befestigungsprofil eines elektrischen Geräts und Anlage, die ein solches Befestigungsprofil umfasst[2010/45]
English:Retaining profile for an electrical appliance and installation having this retaining profile[2010/45]
French:Profilé de fixation d'un appareil électrique et installation comportant le profilé de fixation[2010/45]
Examination procedure03.05.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.05.2011Examination requested  [2011/24]
19.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2013Fee for grant paid
10.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.12.2012
Opposition(s)11.04.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.05.2010
AL10.07.2013
AT10.07.2013
BG10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
IT10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
MK10.07.2013
MT10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
SM10.07.2013
TR10.07.2013
NO10.10.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU04.05.2010
AT10.07.2013
BG10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
IT10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
MK10.07.2013
MT10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
SM10.07.2013
TR10.07.2013
NO10.10.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2016/33]HU04.05.2010
AT10.07.2013
BG10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
IT10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
MT10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
SM10.07.2013
TR10.07.2013
NO10.10.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2016/32]HU04.05.2010
AT10.07.2013
BG10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
IT10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
MT10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
SM10.07.2013
NO10.10.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2016/28]AT10.07.2013
BG10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
IT10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
MT10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
SM10.07.2013
NO10.10.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2016/22]AT10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
IT10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
MT10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
SM10.07.2013
NO10.10.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2016/16]AT10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
IT10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
MT10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
NO10.10.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2015/09]AT10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
IT10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
MC10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
NO10.10.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/24]AT10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
IT10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
NO10.10.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/23]AT10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
CZ10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
EE10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
SK10.07.2013
NO10.10.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/22]AT10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
RO10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
NO10.10.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/21]AT10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
DK10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
NO10.10.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/18]AT10.07.2013
CY10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
NO10.10.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/14]AT10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
NL10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
CY11.09.2013
NO10.10.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/12]AT10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
LV10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
CY11.09.2013
NO10.10.2013
GR11.10.2013
ES21.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/11]AT10.07.2013
FI10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
PL10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
CY11.09.2013
NO10.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/10]AT10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
CY11.09.2013
NO10.10.2013
IS10.11.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/09]AT10.07.2013
HR10.07.2013
LT10.07.2013
SE10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
NO10.10.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/08]LT10.07.2013
SI10.07.2013
NO10.10.2013
PT11.11.2013
Former [2014/07]SI10.07.2013
NO10.10.2013
Former [2013/49]SI10.07.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2255727  (WEIDEL MARIE [FR]) [X] 1-10 * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US3603918  (WOERTZ HANS) [X] 1-10 * figure 2 *;
 [X]US4190309  (GLASS IRVING J [US]) [X] 1-10 * figures 2-5 *;
 [X]US5522704  (CASTEEL MALLARD [US]) [X] 1-10 * figure 4 *;
 [X]US3680030  (JOHNSON ERNEST E) [X] 1-10 * figure 8 *;
 [X]GB1588540  (LITA) [X] 1,3 * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US2003223234  (TANG SHIH CHUAN [TW]) [X] 1,3 * figures 9,10 *;
 [X]US6203339  (NIEMINEN EERO [FI]) [X] 1,3 * figure 2 *;
 [X]GB1169319  (BRITISH LIGHTING IND LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * figure 1 *