EP2450768 - Startup circuit for self-supplied voltage regulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dialog Semiconductor GmbH Neue Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim/Teck-Nabern / DE | [2012/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stellberger, Achim, Dr. Augustastrasse 42 76709 Kronau / DE | 02 /
Schwiderski, Frank Altweg 5 79346 Endigen / DE | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Schuffenecker, Thierry 120 Chemin de la Maure 06800 Cagnes-sur-Mer / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Schuffenecker, Thierry 120 Chemin de la Maure 06800 Cagnes sur Mer / FR | Application number, filing date | 10368037.7 | 20.09.2010 | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2450768 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2450768 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/575, H02M1/36 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
G05F1/575 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Title | German: | Starterschaltung für Selbstversorgungsspannungsregler | [2012/19] | English: | Startup circuit for self-supplied voltage regulator | [2012/19] | French: | Circuit de démarrage pour régulateur de tension auto-alimenté | [2012/19] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 18.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 18.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/43] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 18.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 18.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.03.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.09.2010 | AL | 13.11.2013 | AT | 13.11.2013 | BE | 13.11.2013 | BG | 13.11.2013 | CY | 13.11.2013 | CZ | 13.11.2013 | DK | 13.11.2013 | EE | 13.11.2013 | ES | 13.11.2013 | FI | 13.11.2013 | HR | 13.11.2013 | IT | 13.11.2013 | LT | 13.11.2013 | LV | 13.11.2013 | MC | 13.11.2013 | MK | 13.11.2013 | MT | 13.11.2013 | NL | 13.11.2013 | PL | 13.11.2013 | RO | 13.11.2013 | SE | 13.11.2013 | SI | 13.11.2013 | SK | 13.11.2013 | SM | 13.11.2013 | TR | 13.11.2013 | NO | 13.02.2014 | GR | 14.02.2014 | IS | 13.03.2014 | PT | 13.03.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 20.09.2010 | |
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MK | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
TR | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 20.09.2010 | |
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
TR | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 20.09.2010 | |
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 13.11.2013 | |
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 13.11.2013 | |
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 13.11.2013 | |
NO | 13.02.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5610709 (ARRINGTON LEE O [US], et al) [X] 1,6,10 * column 18, line 66 - column 19, line 64; figure 11 * [I] 1-23; | [I]US2009256534 (VIDETICH JOHN G [US], et al) [I] 1-23 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0007] *; | [A]US5589891 (MCCRACKEN WILLIAM P [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]US4460951 (FENTER WILLIAM S [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4051392 | US4333047 | US4476428 | US4567426 | US4740742 | US5612641 | US5666044 | US5742155 | US5969549 | US6963191 | US7265529 | US7436244 | US7477532 | US7583070 | US2005077933 | US2009021229 |