blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2284254

EP2284254 - Mammalian cell culture media which comprise supernatant from Cohn fractionation stages and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.02.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 12.08.2020  [2020/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grifols, S.A.
C/Jesús y María, 6
08022 Barcelona / ES
[2017/13]
Former [2011/07]For all designated states
Grifols, S.A.
C/JESÚS Y MARÍA, 6
08022 Barcelona / ES
Inventor(s)01 / Jorquera Nieto, Juan Ignacio
Poligono Industrial Levante
c/ Can Guasch, 2
08150 Parets del Valles Barcelona / ES
02 / Costa Rierola, Montserrat
Poligono Industrial Levante
c/ Can Guasch, 2
08150 Parets del Valles Barcelona / ES
03 / Diez Cervantes, José Maria
Poligono Industrial Levante
c/ Can Guasch, 2
08150 Parets del Valles Barcelona / ES
 [2017/13]
Former [2011/07]01 / Jorquera Nieto, Juan Ignacio
Poligono Industrial Levante c/ Can Guasch, 2
08150 Parets del Valles Barcelona / ES
02 / Costa Rierola, Montserrat
Poligono Industrial Levante c/ Can Guasch, 2
08150 Parets del Valles Barcelona / ES
03 / Diez Cervantes, José Maria
Poligono Industrial Levante c/ Can Guasch, 2
08150 Parets del Valles Barcelona / ES
Representative(s)Durán Moya, Luis-Alfonso, et al
Durán-Corretjer
Còrsega, 329
(Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal)
08037 Barcelona / ES
[2017/13]
Former [2011/07]Durán Moya, Luis-Alfonso, et al
Durán-Corretjer Còrsega, 329 (Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal)
08037 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date10380080.118.06.2010
[2011/07]
Priority number, dateES2009003052628.07.2009         Original published format: ES 200930526
[2011/07]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2284254
Date:16.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2284254
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.2010
ClassificationIPC:C12N5/00
[2011/07]
CPC:
C12N5/0056 (EP,US); C12N5/0031 (ES); C12N5/0037 (EP,US);
C12N2500/84 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/13]
Former [2011/07]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Säugetier Zellkultur Medium das Überstand von Cohn Fraktionierungsstadien umfasst und Verwendungen davon[2011/07]
English:Mammalian cell culture media which comprise supernatant from Cohn fractionation stages and use thereof[2011/07]
French:Milieux pour la culture de cellules de mammiferes comprenant les surnagenants obtenus a partir des etapes de fractionnement Cohn et leurs utilisations.[2011/07]
Examination procedure06.10.2010Examination requested  [2011/07]
07.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
10.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
20.01.2017Fee for grant paid
20.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.02.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
20.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP14187810.8  / EP2826854
EP16159739.8  / EP3059305
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.05.2014
Opposition(s)03.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
07.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
02.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL29.03.2017
CY29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
MK29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
LU18.06.2017
MT18.06.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
[2020/33]
Former [2019/51]CY29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
MK29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
LU18.06.2017
MT18.06.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2019/46]CY29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
LU18.06.2017
MT18.06.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2018/43]DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
LU18.06.2017
MT18.06.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2018/25]DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
LU18.06.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2018/21]DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
LU18.06.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2018/11]DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2018/09]DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/51]EE29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SM29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/50]EE29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/41]HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0264748  (INST MOLECULAR BIOLOGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1,7,11 * abstract * * page 2, lines 21-26 * * page 3, lines 1-33 * * page 6, lines 8-29 * [Y] 2,12;
 [Y]WO9418310  (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [Y] 4,10 * abstract * * page 9, lines 5-16 *;
 [Y]EP0201800  (MILES LAB [US]) [Y] 2,4,10,12 * abstract * * page 6, lines 6-12 *;
 [XD]GB2166756  (ANDA BIOLOG) [XD] 1-3,6,7,11-13 * abstract * * page 2, lines 16-57; claims 1-3 *;
 [X]EP0440509  (COMMON SERVICES AGENCY [GB]) [X] 1,3,6,7,11,13 * abstract * * column 1, lines 1-4 * * column 2, lines 13-40 * * column 6, line 6 - column 7, line 27 *;
 [X]EP0143648  (NAT RES DEV [GB]) [X] 1,3,6,7,11,13 * abstract * * page 6, lines 24-30 * * page 7, lines 3-22 * * page 8, lines 9-24 * * page 9, lines 1-11 * * page 13, line 29 - page 14, line 5 *;
 [X]  - HEALY G M ET AL, "Selective nucleolar uptake of ok-acid glycoprotein by mammalian cells in tissue culture", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA 1967, (1967), vol. 148, no. 2, ISSN 0006-3002, pages 556 - 558, XP002597027 [X] 1,5-7,11 * page 556, paragraphs 1,2 *
 [X]  - JO E-C ET AL, "MICROCARRIER CULTURE OF BOWES MELANOMA CELLS IN SERUM-FREE MEDIUM WITH HUMAN PLASMA FRACTION IV-4-PLUS-V", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (1991), vol. 38, no. 3, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 247 - 253, XP002607822 [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 247, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 249, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 250, column 1; figure 4 *
by applicantEP0143648
 EP0440509
 EP0264748
 WO9418310
 GB2166756
 WO2004055174
 EP1820852
 CA1177424
    - EAGLE, H., "The specific aminoacid requirements of mammalian cells (strain L) in tissue culture", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1955), vol. 214, page 839
    - MORGAN, J.G.; MORTON, J.H.; PARKER, R.C., "Nutrition of animal cells in tissue culture. I Initial studies on a synthetic medium", PROC. SOC. EXP. BIOL. MED., (1950), vol. 73, page 1
    - EVANS, V.J.; BRYANT, J.C.; FIORAMONTI, M.C.; MCQUILKIN, W.T.; SANFORD, K.K.; EARLE, W.R., "Studies of nutrient media for tissue C cells in vitro. I A protein-free chemically defined medium for cultivation of strain L cells", CANCER RES., (1956), vol. 16, page 77
    - HAM, R.G., "An improved nutrient solution for diploid Chinese hamster and human cell lines", EXP. CELL RES., (1963), vol. 29, page 515
    - HAM, R.G., "Clonal growth of mammalian cells in a chemically defined synthetic medium", PROC. NATL. SCI. USA, (1965), vol. 53, page 288
    - HAM, R.G.; MCKEEHAN, W.L., "Development of improved media and culture conditions for clonal growth of normal diploid cells", IN VITRO, (1978), vol. 14, pages 11 - 22
    - BARNES, D.; SATO, G., "Methods for growth of cultured cells in serum-free medium", ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1980), vol. 102, pages 255 - 270
    - MACLEOD, ADVANCES IN BIOCHEMICAL ENGINEERING/BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 37
    - FERNANDEZ J. ET AL., SANGRE, (1996), vol. 41, no. 3, page 42
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.