Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2395003

EP2395003 - Pyrazole compounds as sigma receptor inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.11.2012
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.12.2012  [2012/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Laboratorios del Dr. Esteve, S.A.
Avda. Mare de Déu de Montserrat, 221
08041 Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [2011/50]For all designated states
Laboratorios del. Dr. Esteve, S.A.
Avda. Mare de Déu de Montserrat 221
08041 Barcelona / ES
Inventor(s)01 / Garcia Lopez, Monica
Gran Via de les Corts Catalanes, 911, 2n1a
E-08018 Barcelona / ES
02 / Torrens Jover, Antoni
Carrer del Raco, 8-2°2a
E-08221 Terrasa (Barcelona) / ES
03 / Diaz Fernandez, Jose Luis
C/Cadi, 21
E-08240 Manresa (Barcelona) / ES
04 / Caamano Moure, Ana Maria
C/Raina 16,1°
E-15705 Santiago de Compostela (A Coruna) / ES
 [2011/50]
Representative(s)ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L.
Avenida de Burgos, 16D
Edificio Euromor
28036 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2011/50]ABG Patentes, S.L.
Avenida de Burgos 16D Edificio Euromor
28036 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date10382148.427.05.2010
[2011/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2395003
Date:14.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:C07D413/06, C07D401/12, C07D403/12, C07D413/12, C07D413/14, A61K31/4025, A61K31/454, A61K31/496, A61K31/5377, A61P25/00
[2011/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Pyrazolverbindungen als Sigmarezeptor-Inhibitoren[2011/50]
English:Pyrazole compounds as sigma receptor inhibitors[2011/50]
French:Composés pyrazoliques en tant qu'inhibiteurs du récepteur sigma[2011/50]
Examination procedure15.06.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/50]
23.07.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2012/50]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAI]WO2008108517  (KOREA RES INST CHEM TECH [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-9,12-15,17 * examples 145-154, 175; claims 1, 8, 9 * [A] 10 [I] 4;
 [X]US6509367  (MARTIN BILLY R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,12-17 * column 7, line 32 - line 55; compounds O-848 *;
 [XY]WO2007002559  (EXELIXIS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,12-15,17 * example 46; claim 164 * [Y] 11;
 [X]EP0248594  (ORTHO PHARMA CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,9,12-17 * claim 12; compound 96 *;
 [X]JP2004196678  ;
 [Y]EP1829866  (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES]) [Y] 11 * Scheme I *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 51, Database accession no. 2004-529624, XP002605609 & JP2004196678 A 20040715 (DAINIPPON PHARM CO LTD) [X] 1-3,9,12,13,17 * abstract; compound 20 on page 39; compound in paragraph [0223] *
 [X]  - PETRIE C R ET AL, "A NOVEL BIOTINYLATED ADENYLATE ANALOGUE DERIVED FROM PYRAZOLOÚ3,4-D 3/4 PYRIMIDINE FOR LABELING DNA PROBES", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US LNKD- DOI:10.1021/BC00012A011, (19911101), vol. 2, no. 6, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 441 - 446, XP000572789 [X] 1,2,9 * compound 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc00012a011
 [X]  - D.-M. SHEN, M. SHU, K. T. CHAPMAN, "Versatile and Efficient Solid-Phase Syntheses of Pyrazoles and Isoxazoles", ORGANIC LETTERS, (20000408), vol. 2, no. 18, pages 2789 - 2792, XP002605610 [X] 1-3,9 * compound 11a1 (footnote (11)) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/OL006197H
 [X]  - K. V. SHVIDENKO, K. G. NAZARENKO, T. I. SHVIDENKO, A. A. TOLMACHEV, "Recyclization Reactions of 2-(1-Benzoylpyrrolidin-2-ylidene)malononitrile", CHEMISTRY OF HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS, (20100501), vol. 46, no. 1, pages 56 - 60, XP002605611 [X] 1-3,9 * compounds 5a-c *
 [X]  - "Diethyl-[3-(5-methyl-1-phenyl-1H-pyrazol-3-yl)-propyl]amine", BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 213356, XP002605612 [X] 1-3,5,6,9 * the whole document *
    [ ] - M. J. S. DEWAR, "Attempts to find new Antimalarials. Part XXI", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1944), pages 615 - 619
 [X]  - "Methyl-{3-[5-(4-nitro-phenyl)-1-phenyl-1H-pyrazol-3-yl]propyl}-amine", BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 705147, XP002605613 [X] 1-3,9 * the whole document *
    [ ] - V. VIRMANI ET AL., INDIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, SECTION B: ORGANIC CHEMISTRY INCLUDING MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1979), vol. 17, pages 472 - 477
 [X]  - "Methyl-{4-[5-(4-nitro-phenyl)-1-phenyl-1H-pyrazol-3-yl]-butyl}amine", BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 706821, XP002605614 [X] 1-3,9 * the whole document *
 [X]  - "Methyl-{5-[5-(4-nitro-phenyl)-1-phenyl-1H-pyrazol-3-yl]-pentyl}-amine", BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 710983, XP002605615 [X] 1-3,9 * the whole document *
by applicantWO9109594
 EP0414289
 EP0445974
 EP0431943
 EP0518805
 WO02102387
 US4337263
 FR2301250
 US2003144309
 WO02092573
 WO2004017961
 US6492529
 WO2004016592
 WO2006021462
 WO2007098964
 EP0529973
 WO2007079086
    - WALKER, J.M. ET AL., PHARMACOLOGICAL REVIEWS, (1990), vol. 42, page 355
    - SNYDER, S.H.; LARGENT, B.L., J. NEUROPSYCHIATRY, (1989), vol. 1, page 7
    - QUIRION, R. ET AL., TRENDS PHARMACOL. SCI., (1992), vol. 13, pages 85 - 86
    - HANNER, M. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1996), vol. 93, pages 8072 - 8077
    - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1998), vol. 120, page 6621
    - ANGEW. CHEM., INT. ED., (1998), vol. 37, page 2090
    - CHEM. REV., (1989), vol. 89, pages 863 - 927
    - TOP. STEREOCHEM., (1994), vol. 21, page 1
    - DEHAVEN-HUDKINS, D. L.; L.C. FLEISSNER; F. Y. FORD-RICE, "Characterization of the binding of [3H](+)pentazocine to ? recognition sites in guinea pig brain", EUR. J. PHARMACOL., (1992), vol. 227, pages 371 - 378
    - LOWRY, O.H.; N.J. ROSEBROUGH; A.L. FARR; R.J. RANDALL, "Protein measurement with the Folin phenol reagent", J. BIOL. CHEM, (1951), vol. 193, page 265