Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2381029

EP2381029 - Method for operating a washing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/43]Method for operating a washing machine and washing machine
[2015/45]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.06.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Miele & Cie. KG
Carl-Miele-Straße 29
33332 Gütersloh / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/43]For all designated states
Miele & Cie. KG
Carl-Miele-Strasse 29
33332 Gütersloh / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Sieding, Dirk
Haydnstrasse 3
44534 Lünen / DE
 [2011/43]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2011/43]
Application number, filing date10401061.626.04.2010
[2011/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2381029
Date:26.10.2011
Language:DE
[2011/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2381029
Date:04.07.2012
Language:DE
[2012/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:D06F58/20, D06F58/28, D06F39/00
[2011/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/43]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Waschmaschine[2015/45]
English:Method for operating a washing machine[2015/45]
French:Procédé de fonctionnement d'un lave-linge[2015/45]
Former [2011/43]Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Waschmaschine und Waschmaschine
Former [2011/43]Method for operating a washing machine and washing machine
Former [2011/43]Procédé de fonctionnement d'un lave-linge et lave-linge
Examination procedure15.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/43]
06.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.04.2012Fee for grant paid
27.04.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.02.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.04.2013  11.04.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A.
Via Carlo Pisacane 1
20016 Pero (MI) / IT
Opponent's representative
Spina, Alessandro
Whirlpool EMEA SpA
Via Carlo Pisacane, 1
20016 Pero (MI) / IT
 [2018/29]
Former [2018/08]
Opponent(s)01  03.04.2013  11.04.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A.
Via Carlo Pisacane 1
20016 Pero (MI) / IT
Opponent's representative
Guerci, Alessandro
Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A.
Patent Department
Via Aldo Moro 5
21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta (VA) / IT
Former [2017/09]
Opponent(s)01  03.04.2013  11.04.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A.
Via Carlo Pisacane 1
20016 Pero (MI) / IT
Opponent's representative
Guerci, Alessandro
Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27
21025 Comerio (VA) / IT
Former [2016/51]
Opponent(s)01  03.04.2013  11.04.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Indesit Company S.p.A.
Viale Aristide Merloni, 47
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
Opponent's representative
Guerci, Alessandro
Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27
21025 Comerio (VA) / IT
Former [2013/19]
Opponent(s)01  03.04.2013   
Indesit Company S.p.A.
Viale Aristide Merloni, 47
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
Opponent's representative
Santonicola, Paolo
Indesit Company S.p.A. Industrial Property Management Team Via Lamberto Corsi, 55
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
10.05.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.09.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.10.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition18.12.2015Appeal received No.  T2341/15
07.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
12.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.04.2010
CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MC04.07.2012
MK04.07.2012
MT04.07.2012
NL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SM04.07.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
IE26.04.2013
LU26.04.2013
BE30.04.2013
GB26.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
AT26.04.2015
[2016/36]
Former [2015/34]HU26.04.2010
CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MC04.07.2012
MK04.07.2012
MT04.07.2012
NL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SM04.07.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
IE26.04.2013
LU26.04.2013
BE30.04.2013
GB26.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/32]CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MC04.07.2012
MK04.07.2012
MT04.07.2012
NL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SM04.07.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
IE26.04.2013
BE30.04.2013
GB26.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/24]CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MC04.07.2012
MT04.07.2012
NL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SM04.07.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
IE26.04.2013
BE30.04.2013
GB26.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/13]CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MC04.07.2012
MT04.07.2012
NL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
IE26.04.2013
BE30.04.2013
GB26.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/09]CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MC04.07.2012
NL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
IE26.04.2013
BE30.04.2013
GB26.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/08]CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MC04.07.2012
NL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
IE26.04.2013
BE30.04.2013
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2014/20]CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MC04.07.2012
NL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
IE26.04.2013
BE30.04.2013
Former [2014/09]CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MC04.07.2012
NL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
BE30.04.2013
Former [2014/01]CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MC04.07.2012
NL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
Former [2013/34]CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
NL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
Former [2013/15]CY04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
NL04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
Former [2013/13]CY04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
Former [2013/12]CY04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
Former [2013/11]CY04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
Former [2013/10]CY04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
NO04.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
Former [2013/09]FI04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
NO04.10.2012
Former [2013/08]LT04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
NO04.10.2012
Former [2012/51]SI04.07.2012
Documents cited:Search[I]DE102007041906  (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [I] 1,2,5,6,8,9 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0036]; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2006129912  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]; JEONG SEONG HAI [KR]; CHO HUNG MYONG [KR]) [A] 1,2,9 * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0138]; figures 1,4,5 *