blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2415916

EP2415916 - Method and apparatus for detecting accidental stops of the yarn on a knitting line [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.01.2016
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2016No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.02.2016  [2016/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L.G.L. Electronics S.p.A.
Via Ugo Foscolo, 156
24024 Gandino (Bergamo) / IT
[2012/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Zenoni, Pietro
Via Montegrappa, 3
24026 Leffe (BG) / IT
02 / Pedrini, Giovanni
Via Costi, 3
24026 Leffe (BG) / IT
03 / Gotti, Luca
Via Matteotti, 26
24021 Albino (BG) / IT
 [2015/10]
Former [2012/06]01 / Zenoni, Pietro
Via Montegrappa 3
24026 Leffe (BG) / IT
02 / Pedrini, Giovanni
Via Costi, 3
24026 Leffe (BG) / IT
03 / Gotti, Luca
Via Matteotti, 26
24021 Albino (BG) / IT
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2015/10]Spandonari, Carlo, et al
Spandonari & Modiano s.r.l.
Corso Duca degli Abruzzi 16
10129 Torino / IT
Former [2012/06]Spandonari, Carlo, et al
Spandonari & Modiano s.r.l. Corso Duca degli Abruzzi 16
10129 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date10425268.904.08.2010
[2012/06]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2415916
Date:08.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2415916
Date:04.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2011
ClassificationIPC:D04B35/12, D04B15/48
[2014/44]
CPC:
D04B15/486 (EP,US); D04B35/14 (KR); D04B35/10 (KR);
D04B35/12 (EP,KR,US)
Former IPC [2012/06]D04B15/48, D04B35/10
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   GB,   IT,   SE [2012/06]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erkennung unbeabsichtigten Anhaltens des Garns auf einer Fertigungsstrasse für Strickwaren[2014/44]
English:Method and apparatus for detecting accidental stops of the yarn on a knitting line[2012/06]
French:Procédé et appareil pour détecter des arrêts accidentels de fil dans une chaîne de fabrication tricotage[2014/44]
Former [2012/06]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erkennung unbeabsichtigten Anhaltens des Garns auf einer Strickzeile
Former [2012/06]Procédé et appareil pour détecter des arrêts accidentels de fil dans un rang de tricot
Examination procedure26.05.2011Examination requested  [2012/06]
13.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2015Fee for grant paid
23.01.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.01.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.11.2014
Opposition(s)07.12.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4259852  (JACOBSSON KURT A G) [A] 1* abstract *;
 [A]EP1502980  (LGL ELECTRONICS SPA [IT]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0022]; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP2031106  (LGL ELECTRONICS SPA [IT]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0017]; figure 1 *
by applicantEP20090425262
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.