Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2382422 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2382422



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 260
27.02.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
27.03.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.03.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
13.03.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
13.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.01.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
06.01.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.11.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
25.11.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.11.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.11.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
25.07.2013 General enquiry Search / examination 1
28.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
28.02.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
28.02.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
28.02.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
28.02.2013 Description Search / examination 3
28.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.02.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.02.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.02.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.11.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
19.11.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.07.2012 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
09.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.07.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
03.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.07.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
03.07.2012 Annex Search / examination 3
03.07.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.07.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.07.2012 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
03.07.2012 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
01.06.2012 Claim deemed abandoned Search / examination 2
09.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.03.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.03.2012 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
06.12.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
06.12.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
06.12.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
06.10.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.08.2011 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
27.07.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
11.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.07.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
20.05.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
24.03.2011 Republication of A1/A2 Pamphlet -amended claims and/or statement Search / examination 5
20.01.2011 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
20.01.2011 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
29.11.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
29.11.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
29.11.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
04.08.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 41
04.08.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 30
15.07.2010 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 28
06.01.2010 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
06.01.2010 Claims International Searching Authority 3
06.01.2010 Description International Searching Authority 15
06.01.2010 Drawings International Searching Authority 9