blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2382422


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
01.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
31.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
27.02.2015 No opposition filed within time limit published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
06.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
30.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
05.12.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
14.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
07.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
31.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
17.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
21.03.2014 (Expected) grant published on  23.04.2014  [2014/17]
18.03.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
18.03.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
20.01.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.11.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.11.2013 Change - German title published on  04.12.2013  [2013/49]
01.11.2013 Change - English title published on  04.12.2013  [2013/49]
01.11.2013 Change - French title published on  04.12.2013  [2013/49]
06.09.2013 Change - classification published on  09.10.2013  [2013/41]
06.09.2013 Change - classification published on  09.10.2013  [2013/41]
06.09.2013 Change - German title published on  09.10.2013  [2013/41]
06.09.2013 Change - French title published on  09.10.2013  [2013/41]
01.03.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
25.02.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.02.2013 First examination report
23.11.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.11.2012 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
23.07.2012 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
23.07.2012 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
23.07.2012 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
18.07.2012 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
18.07.2012 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
13.07.2012 Amendment by applicant
01.06.2012 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
14.12.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.09.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.11.2011  [2011/44]
30.09.2011 Request for examination filed published on  02.11.2011  [2011/44]
15.09.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2011 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
22.07.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
21.01.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
31.07.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
17.07.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
05.02.2010 PCT data prior to European publication