blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2382422
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2011271948Global Dossier 10.11.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2010GB50013 06.01.2010
GB0904718 19.03.2009
GB0900259 09.01.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2749249Global Dossier 03.01.2017C
CA2749249 15.07.2010A1
Priority number Date
WO2010GB50013 06.01.2010
GB0904718 19.03.2009
GB0900259 09.01.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2382422Global Dossier 23.04.2014B1
EP2382422 02.11.2011A2
Priority number Date
WO2010GB50013 06.01.2010
GB0904718 19.03.2009
GB0900259 09.01.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2382422T 14.07.2014T3
Priority number Date
WO2010GB50013 06.01.2010
GB0904718 19.03.2009
GB0900259 09.01.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2480271T 25.07.2014T3
Priority number Date
WO2010GB50013 06.01.2010
GB0904718 19.03.2009
GB0900259 09.01.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB2466925 14.07.2010A
GB0900259D 11.02.2009D0
Priority number Date
GB0900259 09.01.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB2459348 07.04.2010B
GB2459348 28.10.2009A
GB0904718D 06.05.2009D0
Priority number Date
GB0900259 09.01.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ594197 30.11.2012A
Priority number Date
WO2010GB50013 06.01.2010
GB0904718 19.03.2009
GB0900259 09.01.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2010079352Global Dossier 24.03.2011A4
WO2010079352 20.01.2011A3
WO2010079352 15.07.2010A2
Priority number Date
GB0904718 19.03.2009
GB0900259 09.01.2009