Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2382422

EP2382422 - STOVE COMPRISING AN APPARATUS FOR CAPTURING HEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/44]APPARATUS FOR CAPTURING HEAT FROM A STOVE
[2013/49]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2015
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kinxerg Limited
Ty Cerrig Ffordd Trelan Cilcain
Mold, Flintshire CH7 5NX / GB
[2011/44]
Inventor(s)01 / REDFORD, Simon
Ty Cerrig
Ffordd Trelan
Cilcain
Mold Flintshire CH7 5NX / GB
 [2011/44]
Representative(s)Hamilton, Alistair
AHIP
PO Box 8001
Kirkcudbright DG6 9AA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/44]Hamilton, Alistair
Ty Eurgain, Cefn Eurgain Lane Rhosesmor
Mold, North Wales CH7 6PG / GB
Application number, filing date10701038.106.01.2010
WO2010GB50013
Priority number, dateGB2009000025909.01.2009         Original published format: GB 0900259
GB2009000471819.03.2009         Original published format: GB 0904718
[2011/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010079352
Date:15.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2382422
Date:02.11.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2010
[2011/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2382422
Date:23.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:F24B7/02, F24D11/00, F24H6/00, F24B1/187
[2013/41]
Former International [2011/44]F24B1/187, F24H6/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/17]
Extension statesAL28.07.2011
BA28.07.2011
RS28.07.2011
TitleGerman:OFEN UMFASSEND EINE WÄRMERÜCKGEWINNUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2013/49]
English:STOVE COMPRISING AN APPARATUS FOR CAPTURING HEAT[2013/49]
French:POELE COMPRENANT UN APPAREIL DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE LA CHALEUR[2013/49]
Former [2011/44]VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFFANGEN VON WÄRME AUS EINEM OFEN
Former [2011/44]APPARATUS FOR CAPTURING HEAT FROM A STOVE
Former [2011/44]APPAREIL DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE LA CHALEUR DÉGAGÉE PAR UN FOUR
Entry into regional phase28.07.2011National basic fee paid 
28.07.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.07.2011Examination requested  [2011/44]
01.06.2012Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
09.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2014Fee for grant paid
13.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.02.2013
Opposition(s)26.01.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/14]
Request for further processing for:Loss of rights: Claims
04.07.2012Request for further processing filed
04.07.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.07.2012Decision despatched
04.07.2012Request for further processing filed
04.07.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.07.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
07.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.01.2010
AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MK23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
SM23.04.2014
TR23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2017/38]HU06.01.2010
AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
SM23.04.2014
TR23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
Former [2015/36]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
Former [2015/11]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
Former [2015/10]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
Former [2015/02]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
Former [2014/51]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2014/48]CY23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
Former [2014/47]CY23.04.2014
Cited inInternational search[XYI]JPS6023728  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * figures 2,3 * [Y] 9,11-16 [I] 7,8,10;
 [Y]FR2885994  (SUPRA SA [FR]) [Y] 9,11 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US4143638  (KAMSTRA GORDON E ET AL) [Y] 12 * figures 3,6 *;
 [Y]US4335703  (KLANK BENNO E O) [Y] 13 * column 8, line 6; figure 5 *;
 [Y]US2002014234  (MCCARREN GREGORY M [US]) [Y] 16 * figure 6 * * page 4, paragraph 41 *;
 [Y]US4325353  (HUSA MARLIN V) [Y] 14,15 * figure 1 *
by applicantJPS6023728