Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2389742

EP2389742 - Secure communication establishment process, without sharing prior information [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/48]METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING A SECURED COMMUNICATION WITHOUT PRELIMINARY INFORMATION SHARE
[2017/12]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gemalto SA
6, rue de la Verrerie
92190 Meudon / FR
[2017/29]
Former [2011/48]For all designated states
Gemalto SA
6, rue de la Verrerie
92190 Meudon / FR
Inventor(s)01 / VILLEGAS, Karine
21 rue Massiliée
F-13420 Gemenos / FR
02 / GOUGET, Aline
22 rue Lebrun
F-75013 Paris / FR
03 / GOUBIN, Louis
4 rue Mizon
F-75015 Paris / FR
04 / PAILLIER, Pascal
37 cours de Vincennes
F-75020 Paris / FR
 [2011/48]
Representative(s)Thomas, Christine Marie Catherine , et al
Thales Dis France SA
Intellectual Property Department
6, rue de la Verrerie
92190 Meudon / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/29]Scheer, Luc , et al
Gemalto SA
525, Avenue du Pic de Bertagne
CS 12023
13881 Gémenos Cedex / FR
Former [2011/48](deleted)
...
Application number, filing date10701666.926.01.2010
[2017/29]
WO2010EP50827
Priority number, dateEP2009030506926.01.2009         Original published format: EP 09305069
[2011/48]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010084198
Date:29.07.2010
Language:FR
[2010/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2389742
Date:30.11.2011
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2010
[2011/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2389742
Date:19.07.2017
Language:FR
[2017/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.07.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/32, H04L9/08
[2017/12]
Former International [2011/48]H04L9/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/29]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBAU EINE SICHEREN VERBINDUNG OHNE VORHERIGEN INFORMATIONSAUSTAUSCH[2017/12]
English:Secure communication establishment process, without sharing prior information[2017/12]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTABLISSEMENT DE COMMUNICATION SÉCURISÉE SANS PARTAGE D'INFORMATION PRÉALABLE[2011/48]
Former [2011/48]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER GESICHERTEN KOMMUNIKATION OHNE VORAUSGEHENDE INFORMATIONSTEILUNG
Former [2011/48]METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING A SECURED COMMUNICATION WITHOUT PRELIMINARY INFORMATION SHARE
Entry into regional phase26.08.2011National basic fee paid 
26.08.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.08.2011Examination requested  [2011/48]
06.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2017Fee for grant paid
06.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.11.2012
Opposition(s)20.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
23.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
24.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
IE26.01.2018
LU26.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/09]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
IE26.01.2018
LU26.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/52]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
LU26.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/50]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
LU26.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
Former [2018/47]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
LU26.01.2018
Former [2018/43]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/39]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/24]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/23]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT19.07.2017
ES19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/09]FI19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]US6769060  (DENT PAUL W [US] ET AL) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 3a,3b,4a,4b,5 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 19 *;
 [X]  - MENEZES, VANSTONE, OORSCHOT, Handbook of Applied Cryptography, USA, CRC PRESS LLC, (1997), XP002535828 [X] 1-13 * page 515 - page 520 * * page 559 - page 560 *
Examination   - Menezes, Vanstone, Oorschot, Handbook of Applied Cryptography, USA, CRC Press LLC, (1997), pages 397 - 560, XP000863990