Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2376708

EP2376708 - LOW DENSITY PAPER AND PAPERBOARD WITH TWO-SIDED COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.06.2016
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WestRock MWV, LLC
501 South 5th Street
Richmond, VA 23219-0501 / US
[2017/39]
Former [2016/47]For all designated states
Westrock MWV, LLC
501 South 5th Street
Richmond, VA 23219-0501 / US
Former [2011/42]For all designated states
MeadWestvaco Corporation
501 South 5th Street
Richmond, VA 23219-0501 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FUGITT, Gary
55 Indian Landing Drive
Pittsboro, NC 27312 / US
02 / GREEN, Terrell
9401 Clubvalley Way
Raleigh, NC 27617 / US
03 / BUSHHOUSE, Steven
209 Piperwood Drive
Cary, NC 27518 / US
04 / PARKER, Steven
3020 Hunters Bluff Drive
Raleigh, NC 27606 / US
05 / HOGAN, Jason, Richard
5220 Stonehorse Road
Glen Allen, VA 23059 / US
06 / HER, Wei-Hwa
8067 Torrey Pines Circle
Beaumont, TX 77707 / US
07 / GINTHER, Scott
140 Edmondson Drive
Willow Spring, NC 27592 / US
 [2011/42]
Representative(s)Coulson, Elizabeth Eve , et al
Coulson & Rule
13 Whitehall Road
Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 3AE / GB
[2016/28]
Former [2011/42]Coulson, Elizabeth Eve , et al
Coulson & Associates 1st Floor Suite 5 Newbold Road Rugby
Warwickshire CV21 2LQ / GB
Application number, filing date10703769.905.02.2010
[2016/28]
WO2010US23290
Priority number, dateUS20090151323P10.02.2009         Original published format: US 151323 P
[2011/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010093563
Date:19.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2376708
Date:19.10.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2010
[2011/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2376708
Date:13.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:D21H19/20, D21H19/36, D21H19/54, D21H19/84
[2011/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/28]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PAPIER UND KARTON NIEDRIGER DICHTE MIT BEIDSEITIGER BESCHICHTUNG[2015/05]
English:LOW DENSITY PAPER AND PAPERBOARD WITH TWO-SIDED COATING[2011/42]
French:PAPIER ET CARTON DE FAIBLE DENSITÉ POUR REVETIR LES DEUX FACES[2015/05]
Former [2011/42]PAPIER UND PAPPE NIEDERER DICHTE MIT BEIDSEITIGER BESCHICHTUNG
Former [2011/42]PAPIER ET CARTON DE FAIBLE DENSITÉ AVEC REVÊTEMENT BIFACE
Entry into regional phase26.05.2011National basic fee paid 
26.05.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
26.05.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.05.2011Examination requested  [2011/42]
14.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
18.06.2015Fee for grant paid
18.06.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.05.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.04.2017  24.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Stora Enso Oyj
P. O. Box 309
00101 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Lindberg, Berndt Åke, et al
Stora Enso AB
Group Intellectual Property
Box 9090
650 09 Karlstad / SE
 02  12.04.2017  19.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Holmen AB
Box 5407
114 84 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
 [2017/24]
Former [2017/21]
Opponent(s)01  12.04.2017   
Stora Enso Oyj
P. O. Box 309
00101 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Lindberg, Berndt Åke, et al
Stora Enso AB
Group Intellectual Property
Box 9090
650 09 Karlstad / SE
 02  12.04.2017  19.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Holmen AB
Box 5407
114 84 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Zacco Sweden AB
Valhallavägen 117
Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
18.05.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.11.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.07.2018Date of oral proceedings
16.08.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.08.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition08.10.2018Appeal received No.  T2496/18
17.12.2018Statement of grounds filed
11.10.2018Appeal received No.  T2496/18
11.12.2018Statement of grounds filed
07.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.02.2010
AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CY13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
MK13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
IE05.02.2017
LU05.02.2017
MT05.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]HU05.02.2010
AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CY13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
IE05.02.2017
LU05.02.2017
MT05.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2019/31]HU05.02.2010
AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
IE05.02.2017
LU05.02.2017
MT05.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/43]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
IE05.02.2017
LU05.02.2017
MT05.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/13]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
IE05.02.2017
LU05.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/04]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
LU05.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/51]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/45]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/31]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/13]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT13.07.2016
BE13.07.2016
ES13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/10]BE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
NL13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
Former [2017/07]LT13.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1052328  (VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECH PATENT [DE]) [X] 1,4-13,15,16 * column 1, paragraphs 1,2 * * column 1, paragraph 5 * * column 3, paragraph 14 * * column 4, paragraphs 17,21 * * column 5, paragraphs 23,24 * * column 7, paragraph 31 *;
 [X]JP2009001953  (OJI PAPER CO) [X] 1,2,6-16 * abstract *;
 [X]US2008060774  (ZURAW PAUL J [US], et al) [X] 1,6-9 * page 1, paragraph 4 * * page 4, paragraph 59 * * tables III,IV * * claims 1,10 *;
 [X]US7208039  (JONES J PHILIP E [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6-12 * column 6, lines 10-15 * * column 11, lines 14-30 * * column 12, lines 4-14 * * column 16, lines 14-28 *;
 [X]JP2009013513  (DAIO SEISHI KK) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]US2007169902  (BRELSFORD GREGG L [US], et al) [X] 1,6-11 * page 2, paragraphs 10,13 * * page 4, paragraph 28 *;
 [XP]WO2009117649  (MEADWESTVACO CORP [US], et al) [XP] 1-16 * the whole document *
by applicantEP1052328
 JP2009001953
 US2008060774
 JP2009013513
 US2007169902
 WO2009011764
 US2005247418
 US2009239047
 WO2007100667
 WO2008103154
OppositionUS2005016701
 US2008311416
 US2007256805
 US2007044929
 JPH0631100
 JP2007197879
 JP2006028663
 JP2008255552
 JP2005171425
 JPH09119090
 JPH1072796
 US2005039871
 US2006102303
 JPH06341100
    - "Product sheet 2004, Invercote Creato", paperboard product catalogue, (20040000), pages 1 - 4, XP055371862
    - ENOMAE et al., "Characteristics of Parker Print-Surf Roughness as Compared with Bekk Smoothness", Journal of Fiber Science and Technology, (19970000), vol. 53, no. 3, pages 86 - 95, XP055371868
    - ENOMAE, T. et al., "Characteristics of Parker Print-Surf roughness as compared with Bekk smoothness", Sen'i Gakkaishi, (19960600), URL: http://www.enomae.com/publish/pdf/PPS-Oken.pdf, XP055371868
    - KANO T. et al., "A Comparison between Oken Air Resistance-Smoothness Tester and related Tested in Relation to Measured Values", Japan Tappi Journal, (20081212), vol. 62, no. 12, pages 1570 - 1577, XP008155320

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2524/jtappij.62.1570
    - ENOMAE et al., "Characteristics of Parker Print-Surf Roughness as Compared with Bekk Smoothness", J. Fiber Sci. and Tech., Japan, (19970000), vol. 53, no. 3, pages 86 - 95, XP055371868