Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2393518

EP2393518 - STRUCTURED POLYCYCLIC PEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.01.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
09.07.2019Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BicycleRD Limited
B900
Babraham Research Campus
Cambridge
CB22 3AT / GB
[2018/20]
Former [2018/12]For all designated states
BicycleRD Limited
Meditrina
Babraham Research Campus
Cambridge CB22 3AT / GB
Former [2013/09]For all designated states
Bicycle Therapeutics Limited
Meditrina
Babraham Research Campus
Cambridge CB22 3AT / GB
Former [2012/10]For all designated states
Medical Research Council
2nd Floor, David Phillips Building
Polaris House, North Star Avenue
Swindon, SN2 1FL / GB
Former [2011/50]For all designated states
Medical Research Council
20 Park Crescent
London W1B 1AL / GB
Inventor(s)01 / HEINIS, Christian
Institute of Chemical Sciences and Engineering
Ecole Polytechnique Fèdèrale de Lausanne(EPFL)
CH-1015 Lausanne / CH
02 / TOUATI, Jeremy
24 avenue de Morges
CH-1004 Lausanne / CH
03 / WINTER, Gregory, Paul
MRC Laboratory of Molecular Biology
Hills Road
Cambridge CB2 2QH / GB
 [2012/07]
Former [2011/50]01 / HEINIS, Christian
c/o MRC Laboratory of Molecular Biology
Hills Road
Cambridge CB2 0QH / GB
02 / TOUATI, Jeremy
24 avenue de Morges
CH-1004 Lausanne / CH
03 / WINTER, Gregory, Paul
MRC Laboratory of Molecular Biology
Hills Road
Cambridge CB2 2QH / GB
Representative(s)Maschio, Antonio , et al
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/50]Maschio, Antonio , et al
Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP
10 Carlton Crescent
Southampton
SO15 2EZ / GB
Application number, filing date10703808.504.02.2010
WO2010EP00691
Priority number, dateWO2009GB0030104.02.2009         Original published format: PCT/GB2009/000301
GB2009001377506.08.2009         Original published format: GB 0913775
[2011/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010089117
Date:12.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2393518
Date:14.12.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010
[2011/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K47/48, G01N33/68
[2011/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/50]
TitleGerman:STRUKTURIERTE POLYCYCLISCHE PEPTIDE[2011/50]
English:STRUCTURED POLYCYCLIC PEPTIDE[2011/50]
French:PEPTIDE POLYCYCLIQUE STRUCTURÉ[2011/50]
Entry into regional phase31.08.2011National basic fee paid 
31.08.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
31.08.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.08.2011Examination requested  [2011/50]
03.04.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2016Observations by third parties
09.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.02.2018
08.02.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
08.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination20.04.2018Appeal received No.  T1798/18
03.07.2018Statement of grounds filed
19.11.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.08.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
23.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
08.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[XDPLI]WO2009098450  (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al) [XDP] 1,3-16 * Abstract; Figures; examples. * [L] 1-24 [I] 2,17-24
    [XDPYI] - HEINIS CHRISTIAN ET AL, "Phage-encoded combinatorial chemical libraries based on bicyclic peptides", NATURE CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (200907), vol. 5, no. 7, pages 502 - 507, XP007913181 [XDP] 1,3-16 * Abstract; Fig. 1-5; Methods; p. 505, RH col., last paragraph. * [Y] 2,17-24 [I] 1-24
 [YD]  - CABRAS TIZIANA ET AL, "HPLC-MS characterization of cyclo-statherin Q-37, a specific cyclizatin product of human salivary statherin generated by transglutaminase 2", JOURNAL OF SEPARATION SCIENCE, (200611), vol. 29, no. 17, pages 2600 - 2608, XP007913191 [YD] 2,17-24 * Abstract; p. 2601, LH. col.; last sentence of first paragraph. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jssc.200600244