Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2399257

EP2399257 - METHOD OF SELECTION OF AN AVAILABLE MEMORY SIZE OF A CIRCUIT INCLUDING AT LEAST PROCESSOR AND A MEMORY AND CORRESPONDING PROGRAM AND SMART CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.07.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
13.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thales Dis France SA
6, rue de la Verrerie
92190 Meudon / FR
[2019/36]
Former [2015/15]For all designated states
Gemalto SA
6, rue de la Verrerie
92197 Meudon Cedex / FR
Former [2011/52]For all designated states
Gemalto SA
6, rue de la Verrerie
92197 Meudon / FR
Inventor(s)01 / ARNAL, Benoit
c/o GEMALTO SA
Intellectual Property Dpt
6 rue de la Verrerie
F-92190 MEUDON / FR
 [2011/52]
Representative(s)Cassagne, Philippe M.J. , et al
Thales Dis France SA
Intellectual Property Department
6, rue de la Verrerie
92190 Meudon / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/49]Cour, Pierre , et al
Gemalto SA
Intellectual Property Department
6, rue de la Verrerie
92190 Meudon / FR
Former [2011/52]Cour, Pierre
Gemalto SA Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie
92197 Meudon Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date10703845.709.02.2010
WO2010EP51540
Priority number, dateEP2009030517123.02.2009         Original published format: EP 09305171
[2011/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010094592
Date:26.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2399257
Date:28.12.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2010
[2011/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2399257
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:G11C7/10
[2011/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/52]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUSWAHLVERFAHREN EINES VERFÜGBAREN SPEICHERFORMATS IN EINER SCHALTUNG, DIE MINDESTENS EINEN PROZESSOR UND EINEN SPEICHER SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDE SOFTWARE UND CHIPKARTE UMFASST[2014/27]
English:METHOD OF SELECTION OF AN AVAILABLE MEMORY SIZE OF A CIRCUIT INCLUDING AT LEAST PROCESSOR AND A MEMORY AND CORRESPONDING PROGRAM AND SMART CARD[2011/52]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE SÉLECTION D'UNE CAPACITÉ DE MÉMOIRE DISPONIBLE D'UN CIRCUIT QUI COMPREND AU MOINS UN PROCESSEUR ET UNE MÉMOIRE, ET PROGRAMME ET CARTE À PUCE CORRESPONDANTS[2011/52]
Former [2011/52]VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWAHL EINER VERFÜGBAREN SPEICHERGRÖSSE EINER SCHALTUNG, DIE MINDESTENS EINEN PROZESSOR UND EINEN SPEICHER UMFASST, UND ENTSPRECHENDES PROGRAMM UND SMARTCARD
Entry into regional phase11.08.2011National basic fee paid 
11.08.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.08.2011Examination requested  [2011/52]
09.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.2015Fee for grant paid
28.01.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.01.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.11.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Infineon Technologies AG
Am Campeon 1-12
85579 Neubiberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fechner, Benjamin
Wendelsteinstrasse 29A
82031 Grünwald b. München / DE
 [2016/20]
Former [2016/08]
Opponent(s)01  08.01.2016   
Infineon Technologies AG
Am Campeon 1-12
85579 Neubiberg / DE
17.03.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.07.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
18.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.07.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition13.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2010/17
09.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
17.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
24.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.02.2010
AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MK08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
SM08.04.2015
TR08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
IE09.02.2016
LU09.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/31]HU09.02.2010
AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MK08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
SM08.04.2015
TR08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
IE09.02.2016
LU09.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
Former [2018/29]HU09.02.2010
AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MK08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
SM08.04.2015
TR08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
IE09.02.2016
LU09.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
Former [2018/28]HU09.02.2010
AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MK08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
SM08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
IE09.02.2016
LU09.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
Former [2017/40]AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
IE09.02.2016
LU09.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
Former [2017/07]AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
IE09.02.2016
LU09.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
Former [2016/46]AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
LU09.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
Former [2016/43]AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
LU09.02.2016
Former [2016/42]AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/36]AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/24]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/10]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/50]ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/49]ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL08.04.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1906312  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1A,1B *;
 [A]US5353431  (DOYLE PATRICK F [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 15 - column 8, line 34; figures 1,2 *
 [XI]  - ANONYMOUS, "Verigy InstaPin (PRODUCT OVERVIEW -5989-2597EN)", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20060601), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.verigy.com/content/dav/verigy/Internet/Products/V93000 SOC Series/Licensing/InstaPin HW Licensing/V5989-2597EN.pdf, (20100414), XP002530937 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [I] 6
 [A]  - ANONYMOUS, "Verigy V93000 Pin Scale 800 digital card (PRODUCT OVERVIEW - 5989-2596EN)", INTERNET ARTICLE, http://www.verigy.com/content/dav/verigy/Internet/Products/V93000 SOC Series/Digital Pins/Pin Scale 800 Digital Card/V5989-2596EN.pdf, (20060601), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.verigy.com/content/dav/verigy/Internet/Products/V93000 SOC Series/Digital Pins/Pin Scale 800 Digital Card/V5989-2596EN.pdf, XP002530938 [A] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ANONYMOUS, "FlexNet Licensing End User Guide (VERSION 11.3, DOCUMENT REVISION 01)", INTERNET ARTICLE - MACROVISION, (20060630), pages 1 - 40, URL: http://www.vrcontext.com/download/customerhelp/FlexNet LicensingEndUserGuide.pdf, XP002531465 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS2007011395
by applicantUS2007011395