Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2401798

EP2401798 - METHODS, TRANSMISSION DEVICES AND TRANSMISSION CONTROL SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING POWER WIRELESSLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Change - classificationpublished on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
05.12.2019Change - classificationpublished on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Lübeckertordamm 5
20099 Hamburg / DE
[2013/39]
Former [2012/01]For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Lübeckertordamm 5
20099 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / VAN WAGENINGEN, Dries
RE Aachen Solid State Lighting (SSL)
Weisshausstrasse 2
50266 Aachen / DE
02 / STARING, Antonius, Adriaan, Maria
Apptech - Digital Systems&Technologies
Prof Holstlaan 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / HILGERS, Achim
RE Aachen Solid State Lighting (SSL)
- Budde
Weisshausstrasse 2
52066 Aachen / DE
04 / WAFFENSCHMIDT, Eberhard
RE Aachen Solid State Lighting (SSL)
- Budde
Weisshausstrasse 2
52066 Aachen / DE
 [2012/01]
Representative(s)Kroeze, Johannes Antonius
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2012/01]Kroeze, Johannes Antonius
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date10704210.310.02.2010
WO2010IB50597
Priority number, dateEP2009015386327.02.2009         Original published format: EP 09153863
[2012/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010097725
Date:02.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2401798
Date:04.01.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2010
[2012/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:H02J50/10, H02J50/40, H02J7/02, // H02J50/80
[2020/01]
Former International [2012/01]H02J5/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, ÜBERTRAGUNGSGERÄTE UND ÜBERTRAGUNGSSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR DRAHTLOSE LEISTUNGSÜBERTRAGUNG[2012/01]
English:METHODS, TRANSMISSION DEVICES AND TRANSMISSION CONTROL SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING POWER WIRELESSLY[2012/01]
French:PROCÉDÉS, DISPOSITIFS DE TRANSMISSION ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE TRANSMISSION POUR LA TRANSMISSION DE PUISSANCE SANS FIL[2012/01]
Entry into regional phase27.09.2011National basic fee paid 
27.09.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.09.2011Examination requested  [2012/01]
02.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.11.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.06.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
02.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2005007067  (BAARMAN DAVID W [US], et al) [X] 1,4,10,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0024] - [0031] - [0033] - [0 53] - [0061]; figures 2,7,9 * [Y] 2,5,9,11;
 [Y]US2008315826  (ALBERTH JR WILLIAM P [US], et al) [Y] 2,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0020] - [0039] - [0050] *;
 [Y]US2007042729  (BAAMAN DAVID W [US], et al) [Y] 5,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0024]; claim 12 *;
 [A]US2006113955  (NUNALLY PATRICK [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0057] *;
 [A]US2007171681  (BAARMAN DAVID W [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004142733  (PARISE RONALD J [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0080] - [0081] *