blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2396848 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2396848



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 613
01.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.07.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 18
26.07.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.01.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
24.01.2018 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
19.01.2018 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
18.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.01.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 1
20.11.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.11.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
14.11.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
09.11.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
09.11.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
20.09.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
08.03.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
15.02.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
01.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.02.2016 Claims Appeal 4
01.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
01.02.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 11
10.12.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
04.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
04.12.2015 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
04.12.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
04.12.2015 Means of redress Search / examination 1
23.09.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.09.2015 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 3
28.07.2015 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 5
24.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.06.2015 General enquiry Search / examination 1
24.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.03.2015 Request for correction of the publication Search / examination 6
10.03.2015 Request for correction of the publication Search / examination 2
03.02.2015 Communication regarding a request to amend/correct the documents for grant Search / examination 1
19.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.01.2015 Request for correction of the publication Search / examination 4
09.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.01.2015 Claims Search / examination 4
09.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.01.2015 Request for correction of the publication Search / examination 2
09.01.2015 Request for correction of the publication Search / examination 2
21.11.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
23.10.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.10.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.10.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
09.10.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
09.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
25.09.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.09.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.09.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.09.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 46
02.09.2014 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
12.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
12.08.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
12.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.08.2014 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
13.05.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
13.05.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 48
02.05.2014 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
22.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.04.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
22.04.2014 Description Search / examination 2
22.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.04.2014 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
17.03.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
07.03.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
17.12.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
17.12.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
17.12.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.12.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 48
28.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.11.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.11.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
26.11.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
26.11.2013 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
26.11.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
25.11.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
25.11.2013 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
25.11.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
19.11.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
08.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
08.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
08.11.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
08.11.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
08.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.11.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 4
22.10.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
15.10.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
15.10.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
15.10.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.10.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
04.10.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.09.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
01.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.08.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.08.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
26.07.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
22.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
22.07.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
22.07.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
08.07.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
03.04.2013 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
21.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.12.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
21.12.2012 Claims Search / examination 4
21.12.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.12.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
17.08.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
13.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.08.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.06.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
20.06.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.03.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
23.03.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
23.03.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
23.03.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.11.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.10.2011 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
04.10.2011 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
04.10.2011 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
27.09.2011 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
30.08.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
09.08.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.08.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
27.06.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
25.02.2011 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
07.09.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 56
19.08.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
19.08.2010 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 49
31.05.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
31.05.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
31.05.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 5
05.03.2010 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
05.03.2010 Claims International Searching Authority 4
05.03.2010 Description International Searching Authority 41
05.03.2010 Drawings International Searching Authority 3