Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2403930

EP2403930 - ASHLESS OR REDUCED ASH QUATERNARY DETERGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Lubrizol Corporation
29400 Lakeland Blvd.
Wickliffe, OH 44092-2298 / US
[2019/32]
Former [2012/02]For all designated states
The Lubrizol Corporation
29400 Lakeland Blvd.
Wickliffe, OH 44092-2298 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DELBRIDGE, Ewan E.
29400 Lakeland Blvd.
Wickliffe Ohio 44092-2298 / US
02 / CARRICK, Virginia A.
29400 Lakeland Blvd.
Wickliffe Ohio 44092-2298 / US
03 / PUDELSKI, John K.
29400 Lakeland Blvd.
Wickliffe Ohio 44092-2298 / US
04 / GIESELMAN, Matthew D.
29400 Lakeland Blvd.
Wickliffe Ohio 44092-2298 / US
05 / FRIEND, Christopher L.
P.O. Box 88
Belper Derby DE56 1QN / GB
06 / MOSIER, Patrick E.
29400 Lakeland Blvd.
Wickliffe Ohio 44092-2298 / US
07 / ROGERS, Michelle M.
29400 Lakeland Blvd.
Wickliffe Ohio 44092-2298 / US
08 / TIERNEY, Mark L.
7405 Nightingale Dr. Apt. 5
Holland Ohio 43528 / US
 [2012/02]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2019/32]
Former [2012/24]Mallalieu, Catherine Louise , et al
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2012/02]Bradley, Adrian
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date10706126.901.03.2010
[2019/32]
WO2010US25714
Priority number, dateUS20090156981P03.03.2009         Original published format: US 156981 P
[2012/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010101801
Date:10.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2403930
Date:11.01.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010
[2012/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2403930
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:C10M133/06, C10M135/10, C10M137/12, C10M159/22, C10M159/24, C10M159/12, C10N30/04, C10N40/25
[2012/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/02]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ASCHEFREIE ODER ASCHEÄRMERE QUATERNÄRE DETERGENTIEN[2012/02]
English:ASHLESS OR REDUCED ASH QUATERNARY DETERGENTS[2012/02]
French:DÉTERGENTS QUATERNAIRES SANS CENDRE OU À CENDRE RÉDUITE[2012/02]
Entry into regional phase28.09.2011National basic fee paid 
28.09.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.09.2011Examination requested  [2012/02]
26.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
29.06.2019Fee for grant paid
29.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP19182843.3
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.07.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[AD]US2008307698  (BARTON WILLIAM [GB], et al) [AD] 1-23 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0055]; claim - *;
 [A]US2008052985  (STEVENSON PAUL R [GB], et al) [A] 1-23 * claims 1,9,10,14 *;
 [XDI]US3962104  (SWIETLIK JOSEPH MARIAN, et al) [XD] 1-17,19,22,23 * column 3, line 21 - line 25; example - * [I] 18,20,21;
 [A]US2005070447  (BARNES W PRESTON [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0058] , [0062]; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2004065530  (LUBRIZOL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * page 12, lines 23-29; claim 1 *
by applicantEP0755998