Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2403707

EP2403707 - METHOD AND MANUFACTURING LINE FOR MANUFACTURING WIND TURBINE BLADES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.12.2012
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LM Glasfiber A/S
Jupitervej 6
6000 Kolding / DK
[2013/04]
Former [2012/02]For all designated states
LM Glasfiber A/S
Jupitervej 6
6000 Kolding / DK
Inventor(s)01 / BØRSTING, Dennis André
Kikkenborgvej 43
DK-6000 Kolding / DK
02 / ZHOU, Quinyin
Rønnebærhaven 25
DK-5792 Årslev / DK
03 / VAN DER ZEE, Jacobus Johannes
Lerbjergvej 34
DK-6000 Kolding / DK
 [2012/02]
Representative(s)COPA Copenhagen Patents
Rosenørns Allé 1, 2nd floor
1970 Frederiksberg C / DK
[N/P]
Former [2012/08]Kitchen, Steven Richard , et al
LM Wind Power A/S
Jupitervej 6
6000 Kolding / DK
Former [2012/02]Jensen, Peter Kim , et al
C/o Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33
1780 Copenhagen V / DK
Application number, filing date10706269.705.03.2010
WO2010EP52801
Priority number, dateEP2009015453906.03.2009         Original published format: EP 09154539
[2012/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010100250
Date:10.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/36]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2403707
Date:11.01.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010
[2012/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2403707
Date:23.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:B29C70/38, B29C70/48, F03D1/06
[2012/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/02]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND FERTIGUNGSSTRASSE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WINDTURBINENSCHAUFELN[2012/02]
English:METHOD AND MANUFACTURING LINE FOR MANUFACTURING WIND TURBINE BLADES[2012/02]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET CHAÎNE DE FABRICATION POUR FABRIQUER DES PALES D'ÉOLIENNE[2012/02]
Entry into regional phase13.09.2011National basic fee paid 
13.09.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.09.2011Examination requested  [2012/02]
14.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2012Fee for grant paid
13.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12196704.6  / EP2572867
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.09.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.10.2013  05.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Opponent's representative
Inspicos P/S
Kogle Allé 2
2970 Hørsholm / DK
 02  23.10.2013  05.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 [2019/50]
Former [2017/48]
Opponent(s)01  23.10.2013  05.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Opponent's representative
Johansson, Lars-Erik
Hynell Patenttjänst AB
Box 138
683 23 Hagfors / SE
 02  23.10.2013  05.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
Former [2013/49]
Opponent(s)01  23.10.2013   
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Opponent's representative
Johansson, Lars-Erik
Hynell Patenttjänst AB
Box 138
683 23 Hagfors / SE
 02  23.10.2013   
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2013/48]
Opponent(s)01  23.10.2013   
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Opponent's representative
Johansson, Lars-Erik
Hynell Patenttjänst AB
Box 138
683 23 Hagfors / SE
02.12.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.05.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
16.06.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.06.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition16.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1920/16
26.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
15.08.2016Appeal received
14.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
27.07.2017Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2017/30]
27.11.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.03.2010
AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MK23.01.2013
MT23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
SM23.01.2013
TR23.01.2013
IE05.03.2013
LU05.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MK23.01.2013
MT23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
SM23.01.2013
TR23.01.2013
IE05.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/24]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MT23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
SM23.01.2013
IE05.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/08]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MT23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
IE05.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2014/32]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MT23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
IE05.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2014/07]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
IE05.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2014/03]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
IT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/52]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/49]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/47]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/41]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/40]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/38]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/37]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/36]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/35]BE23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/34]LT23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/33]LT23.01.2013
NO23.04.2013
Cited inInternational search[YD]EP1310351  (BONUS ENERGY AS [DK]) [YD] 1-6,8-14 * paragraphs [0012] , [0018] , [0023] , [0028] *;
 [Y]EP2014449  (AIRBUS ESPANA SL [ES]) [Y] 1-6,8-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0013] , [0026] *;
 [A]WO0032381  (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB], et al) [A] 1,14 * page 1, line 10 - line 11; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4679291  (SCHMEAL WALTER R [US], et al) [A] 1,14 * column 5, line 1 - line 6; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4591402  (EVANS CHARLES B [US], et al) [A] 1,14 * column 2, line 18 - line 45 *;
 [A]US2006042066  (NELSON PAUL E [US]) [A] 1,14 * paragraphs [0044] , [0045]; figure 7 *;
 [A]US4133711  (AUGUST ARTHUR, et al) [A] 1,14 * column 1, line 6 - line 53; figures 1-11 *
by applicantEP1310351
 EP2014449