EP2403633 - COAXIAL COMPACT STATIC MIXER AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ehrfeld Mikrotechnik BTS GmbH Mikroforum Ring 1 55234 Wendelsheim / DE | [2012/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERBSTRITT, Frank St-Gallus-Ring 4 55232 Alzey / DE | [2012/02] | Representative(s) | Lütjens, Henning c/o Bayer Business Services GmbH LP-PL, Building Q 18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2013/16] |
Former [2012/02] | Lütjens, Henning c/o Bayer Business Services GmbH LP-PL, Building Q 18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10706933.8 | 23.02.2010 | WO2010EP01104 | Priority number, date | DE20091011996 | 06.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009011996 | [2012/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010099884 | Date: | 10.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2403633 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2403633 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01F5/06, B01F3/12, B29B7/32 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
B29B7/325 (EP,US);
B01F25/4323 (EP,US);
B01F23/50 (EP,US);
B01F25/4321 (EP,US);
B01F25/43231 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOAXIALER KOMPAKTSTATIKMISCHER SOWIE DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2012/02] | English: | COAXIAL COMPACT STATIC MIXER AND USE THEREOF | [2012/02] | French: | MÉLANGEUR STATIQUE COMPACT COAXIAL ET SON UTILISATION | [2012/02] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 27.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2010 | CY | 17.04.2013 | CZ | 17.04.2013 | DK | 17.04.2013 | EE | 17.04.2013 | FI | 17.04.2013 | HR | 17.04.2013 | IT | 17.04.2013 | LT | 17.04.2013 | LV | 17.04.2013 | MC | 17.04.2013 | MK | 17.04.2013 | MT | 17.04.2013 | PL | 17.04.2013 | RO | 17.04.2013 | SE | 17.04.2013 | SI | 17.04.2013 | SK | 17.04.2013 | SM | 17.04.2013 | TR | 17.04.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | NO | 17.07.2013 | GR | 18.07.2013 | ES | 28.07.2013 | IS | 17.08.2013 | PT | 19.08.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 23.02.2010 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
MT | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
SM | 17.04.2013 | ||
TR | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.02.2010 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
MT | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
SM | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
MT | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
SM | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
MT | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/44] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 17.04.2013 | |
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 17.04.2013 | |
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 17.04.2013 | |
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 17.04.2013 | |
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 17.04.2013 | |
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0113041 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,6,9-11 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 11, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-9 * [A] 2,4,7,8,12,13; | [XA]DE1407515 (DOW CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1,3,5,6,9,11 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 6 - page 9, paragraph 2 * * figures 11-15 * [A] 2,4,7,8,10,12,13; | [XA]GB900656 (ONDERZOEKINGS INST RES) [X] 1-3,5,6,12 * page 1, line 27 - line 70 * * page 4, line 57 - line 93 * * page 4, line 124 - page 5, line 32 * * page 5, line 64 - line 100 * * figure - * [A] 4,7-11,13; | [XA]US3051452 (LEENDERT NOBEL) [X] 1,3,5,6,9,12 * column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 22 * * column 5, line 74 - column 6, line 64 * * figure - * [A] 2,4,7,8,10,11,13 | by applicant | WO2004007063 | WO9509689 | EP1486749 | EP0113041 | DE1407515 | GB900656 | US3051452 | US5904424 | WO9713075 | US6457854 | - Chemical Micro Process Engineering, WILEY-VCH, (2004), page 401 |